Nations Cabinetry, LLC v. Exterior Wholesale Supply, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nations Cabinetry, LLC
Defendant: Exterior Wholesale Supply, LLC, Jason Barbera and Fredrick Heagarty
Case Number: 3:2020cv00954
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Henry E. Hildebrand, IV and Griffin S. Dunham admitted to this court. (dt)
December 4, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jason Barbera.(Hildebrand, Henry)
December 4, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fredrick Heagarty.(Hildebrand, Henry)
December 4, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Exterior Wholesale Supply, LLC.(Hildebrand, Henry)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Natalie Uhlemann is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/4/20. (vk)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Ekman is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/4/20. (vk)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Natalie I. Uhlemann from the United States District Court of Minnesota filed by Nations Cabinetry, LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney John C. Ekman from the United States District Court of Minnesota filed by Nations Cabinetry, LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
December 1, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 and #12 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificates shall be filed within 10 days. (dt)
December 1, 2020 MN State Bar status verified as active for John Ekman, Natalie Uhlemann not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Natalie Uhlemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3265291) by Nations Cabinetry, LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney John Ekman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3265282) by Nations Cabinetry, LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nations Cabinetry, LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Nations Cabinetry, LLC. Fredrick Heagarty served on 11/13/2020. (Roberts, Lauren)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Nations Cabinetry, LLC. Jason Barbera served on 11/13/2020. (Roberts, Lauren)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Nations Cabinetry, LLC. Exterior Wholesale Supply, LLC served on 11/13/2020. (Roberts, Lauren)
November 17, 2020 MN State Bar status verified as active for John Ekman not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (gb)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 (DISREGARD) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference. (dt) Modified on 11/13/2020 (dt).
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Jason Barbera, Exterior Wholesale Supply, LLC, and Fredrick Heagarty. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (kc)
November 6, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL John Ekman: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/27/2020. (dt)
November 6, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lauren Paxton Roberts and Jean Anne Tipps admitted to this court. (dt)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Barbera, Exterior Wholesale Supply, LLC and Fredrick Heagarty (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3250882), filed by Nations Cabinetry, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nations Cabinetry, LLC v. Exterior Wholesale Supply, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exterior Wholesale Supply, LLC
Represented By: Henry E. Hildebrand, IV
Represented By: Griffin S. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Barbera
Represented By: Henry E. Hildebrand, IV
Represented By: Griffin S. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredrick Heagarty
Represented By: Henry E. Hildebrand, IV
Represented By: Griffin S. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nations Cabinetry, LLC
Represented By: John Ekman
Represented By: Jean Anne Tipps
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Represented By: Natalie Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?