JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Ascend Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Ascend Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2020cv00965
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Davidson Lane, II admitted to this court. (vh)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Davidson Lane, II on behalf of Ascend Federal Credit Union (Lane, James)
December 30, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ascend Federal Credit Union.(Edmondson, Thomas)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 11:00 AM will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Ascend Federal Credit Union served on 11/20/2020. (Schwegler, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Ascend Federal Credit Union. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
November 13, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael B. Schwegler and Elizabeth Anne Bowden admitted to this court. (dt)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (dt)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (dt)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ascend Federal Credit Union (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3253038), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Check dated 9/9/2019, #2 Exhibit B - Letter dated 10/9/2019, #3 Exhibit C - Letter 10/1/2019, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Ascend Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael B. Schwegler
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascend Federal Credit Union
Represented By: James Davidson Lane, II
Represented By: Thomas Larry Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?