Patel v. Idemia Identity & Security USA LLC
Plaintiff: Ken Patel
Defendant: Idemia Identity & Security USA LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00968
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2611
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Christopher Anderson admitted to this court. (jm)
December 30, 2020 Filing 10 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Idemia Identity & Security USA LLC.(Anderson, J.)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' motion to continue the January 12, 2021, initial case management conference filed December 28, 2020. Docket Entry No. #8 . For the reasons stated, the motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from January 12, 2021, to 1:30.m, February 17, 2021, to be conducted by telephone conference. See Docket Entry No. #7 . Counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendant or otherwise ensure that Defendant is aware of the rescheduled date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/30/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Continue initial case management conference by Ken Patel. (Steiert, Jennifer)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on November 30, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for 3:30 p.m. on January 12, 2021, will be held telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753, Access Code: 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/02/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/18/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 1/12/2021 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Idemia Identity & Security USA LLC. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (kc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/17/2020) (kc).
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
November 17, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jennifer R. Steiert admitted to this court. (kc)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Idemia Identity & Security USA LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3253921), filed by Ken Patel. ((1) Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Idemia Identity & Security USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idemia Identity & Security USA LLC
Represented By: J. Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Patel
Represented By: Jennifer R. Steiert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?