Securities and Exchange Commission v. CapWealth Advisors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Timothy J. Pagliara, CapWealth Advisors, LLC and Timothy R. Murphy
Case Number: 3:2020cv01064
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 80
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of M. Graham Loomis is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 1/6/2021. (vk)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristin W. Murnahan is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 1/6/2021. (vk)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Timothy J. Pagliara waiver sent on 12/15/2020. (Murnahan, Kristin)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Timothy R. Murphy waiver sent on 12/15/2020. (Murnahan, Kristin)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. CapWealth Advisors, LLC waiver sent on 12/15/2020. (Murnahan, Kristin)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order GA State Bar status verified as active for Madison Graham Loomis and Kristin W. Murnahan not admitted to this court - admitted to the USDC/NDGA - local counsel not required - government attorneys. (dt)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons issued as to CapWealth Advisors, LLC, Timothy R. Murphy and Timothy J. Pagliara. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.)(dt)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for attorney M. Graham Loomis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Loomis, Madison)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Kristin W. Murnahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Murnahan, Kristin)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CapWealth Advisors, LLC, Timothy R. Murphy and Timothy J. Pagliara, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. CapWealth Advisors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Pagliara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CapWealth Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Madison Graham Loomis
Represented By: Kristin W. Murnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?