American Reliable Insurance Company v. Addington et al
Plaintiff: American Reliable Insurance Company
Defendant: Laurie Addington and David Brogdon
Case Number: 3:2021cv00141
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Bench Trial sis et for 12/6/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 11/14/2022. Witness List due by 11/14/2022. Pretrial Conference is set for 11/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/14/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/23/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2021. Discovery due by 12/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2022. Telephone Status Conference is set for 11/15/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 4/20/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 4/20/2021. (Hearing lasted :22)(ms)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 4/20/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 4/16/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by American Reliable Insurance Company. (Balite-Panelo, Fetlework)
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Guillermo (Will) Sylianteng is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 3/28/21. (vk)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Laurie Addington, David Brogdon.(Chastain, Parks)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Hannah Leifel admitted to this court. (kc)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION Participation Via Telephone by American Reliable Insurance Company. (Balite-Panelo, Fetlework)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by American Reliable Insurance Company. David Brogdon served on 3/9/2021. (Balite-Panelo, Fetlework)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Parks T. Chastain on behalf of David Brogdon (Chastain, Parks)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by American Reliable Insurance Company. Laurie Addington served on 3/9/2021. (Balite-Panelo, Fetlework)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Leifel on behalf of All Defendants (Leifel, Hannah)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Parks T. Chastain admitted to this court. (kc)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Parks T. Chastain on behalf of Laurie Addington (Chastain, Parks)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing by American Reliable Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Certificate of Service Doc 9, #2 Attachment Amended Certificate of Service Doc 10)(Balite-Panelo, Fetlework)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order PA State Bar status verified as active for Guillermo Sylianteng not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 and #10 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel and/or parties on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Guillermo (Will) Sylianteng to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3328745) by American Reliable Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration of W. Sylianteng)(Balite-Panelo, Fetlework)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Reliable Insurance Company. (Balite-Panelo, Fetlework)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (kc)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Reliable Insurance Company. (Balite-Panelo, Fetlework)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (kc)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Reliable Insurance Company. (Balite-Panelo, Fetlework)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons issued as to Laurie Addington and David Brogdon. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/25/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 4/20/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Stephen W. Elliott and Fetlework S. Balite-Panelo admitted to this court. (kc)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Guillermo Sylianteng: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 3/17/2021. (kc)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order PA State Bar status verified as active for Guillermo Sylianteng not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laurie Addington and David Brogdon (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3318871), filed by American Reliable Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Reliable Insurance Company v. Addington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Reliable Insurance Company
Represented By: Fetlework S. Balite-Panelo
Represented By: Stephen W. Elliott
Represented By: Guillermo Sylianteng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Addington
Represented By: Hannah Leifel
Represented By: Parks T. Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brogdon
Represented By: Hannah Leifel
Represented By: Parks T. Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?