VPR Brands, LP v. MONQ, LLC
Plaintiff: VPR Brands, LP
Counter Plaintiff: MONQ, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00172
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by VPR Brands, LP. (Novick, Daniel)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Andrew Richard Cheslock to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 04/28/2021. (lh)
April 27, 2021 DC State Bar status verified as active for Andrew R. Cheslock not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against VPR Brands, LP by MONQ, LLC.(Martin, Robert)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Andrew Richard Cheslock to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3359712) by MONQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Andrew Cheslock)(Martin, Robert)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: MOTION #12 to Extend Deadline GRANTED. MONQ, LLC's answer due 4/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/30/2021. (ln)
March 25, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert David Martin admitted to this court. (kc)
March 24, 2021 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MONQ, LLC. (Martin, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by MONQ, LLC. (Martin, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David Martin on behalf of MONQ, LLC (Martin, Robert)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #5 Summons Issued. Mail sent to Daniel Morton Novick. (ln)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by VPR Brands, LP. MONQ, LLC served on 3/5/2021. (Novick, Daniel)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VPR Brands, LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice Accompanying Corrected Business Disclosure)(Novick, Daniel)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 03/4/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
March 4, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#2 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not complete. Counsel shall re-file the document ensuring that the appropriate boxes are marked. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (ln)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to MONQ, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
March 3, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Morton Novick admitted to this court. (ln)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VPR Brands, LP. (ln)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against MONQ, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3323946) filed by VPR Brands, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Patent Number 8,205,622, #2 Exhibit 2 - Claim Chart, Claim 13, #3 Attachment 1 - AO Form 120, #4 Attachment 2 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VPR Brands, LP v. MONQ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: MONQ, LLC
Represented By: Andrew R. Cheslock
Represented By: Robert David Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VPR Brands, LP
Represented By: Daniel Morton Novick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?