Griggs v. Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Phillip Griggs
Defendant: Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00265
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Evert, Jill)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on June 2, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. (Doc. No. #4 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/20/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.(Evert, Jill) Modified on 4/8/2021 (vh).
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/5/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Corporation Listing, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Evert, Jill)
April 2, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#5 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (vh)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Evert, Jill)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (vh) Modified on 4/6/2021 (vh).
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. from Chancery Court for Davidson County, case number 21-0095. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650-3343413) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waiver of Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Citizenship, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)
March 31, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Susan M. Palmer, Jill A. Evert admitted to this court. (vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griggs v. Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Jill A. Evert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Griggs
Represented By: Susan M. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?