Miles v. Onin Staffing, LLC
Plaintiff: Bobby Lee Miles, Jr.
Defendant: Onin Staffing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00275
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 25 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Onin Staffing, LLC. (Bumgarner, Stephen)
May 26, 2021 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Onin Staffing, LLC, filed by Bobby Lee Miles, Jr.(Winfrey, Brian)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on June 7, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Doc. No. #5 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/20/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
May 18, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Onin Staffing, LLC re #17 MOTION for attorney Stephen J. Bumgarner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3369539) (Bumgarner, Stephen)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: On May 12, 2021, Defendant Onin Staffing, LLC, filed a motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). (Doc. No. #18 .) Under Local Rule 7.01(a)(3), any response in opposition must be filed and served within fourteen days of service of the motion. An optional reply may be filed and served within seven days of service of a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/13/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
May 13, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Stephen J. Bumgarner and W. Brad English: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 6/3/2021. (ln)
May 13, 2021 AL State Bar status verified as active for W. Brad English admitted to this court, local counsel required. (ln)
May 12, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Onin Staffing, LLC.(English, W.)
May 12, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Onin Staffing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibit "A")(English, W.) Modified on 6/3/2021 (vh).
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Onin Staffing, LLC. (English, W.)
May 12, 2021 AL State Bar status verified as active for Stephen J. Bumgarner not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (ln)
May 12, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#17 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not sign the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ln)
May 11, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Stephen J. Bumgarner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3369539) by Onin Staffing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment District Court Certificate of Good Standing)(Bumgarner, Stephen)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The motion #15 for extension of time is GRANTED. Onin Staffing, LLC's answer due 5/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/10/2021. (ln)
May 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Onin Staffing, LLC. (English, W.)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc R. Edelman is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 5/5/2021. (vk)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Onin Staffing, LLC answer due 5/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/29/2021. (vh)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Onin Staffing, LLC. (Bumgarner, Stephen)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Onin Staffing, LLC. (Bumgarner, Stephen)
April 29, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Stephen J. Bumgarner not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (vh)
April 29, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Stephen J. Bumgarner: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 5/20/2021. (vh)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT filed by Bobby Lee Miles, Jr re Annotation - Deficiency Notice,,. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Winfrey, Brian)
April 23, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [8,9]: The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (vh)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT filed by Bobby Lee Miles, Jr re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Winfrey, Brian)
April 20, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (vh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Marc R. Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3354310) by Bobby Lee Miles, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing (Middle District of Florida))(Winfrey, Brian)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Notice Regarding Consent of the Parties, Notice Regarding Business Entity Disclosure Statement, and Notice of CMC served on Haley Neubert, as CT Representative for Onin Staffing, LLC on April 9, 2021, filed by Bobby Lee Miles, Jr. (Winfrey, Brian)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/7/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (vh)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Onin Staffing, LLC. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Onin Staffing, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3346333), filed by Bobby Lee Miles, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)
April 5, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Marc R. Edelman: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/26/2021. (vh)
April 5, 2021 FL State Bar status verified as active for Marc R. Edelman not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (vh)
April 5, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brian C. Winfrey admitted to this court. (vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Onin Staffing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Lee Miles, Jr.
Represented By: Brian C. Winfrey
Represented By: Marc R. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onin Staffing, LLC
Represented By: W. Brad English
Represented By: Stephen J. Bumgarner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?