Janney v. NSK America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Douglas B. Janney, III
Defendant: NSK America Corporation and Nakanishi, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00494
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER: Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference #11 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 9/15/2021 at 01:00 PM. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/25/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by NSK America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Brock, F.)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Douglas B. Janney, III. Nakanishi, Inc. served on 7/27/2021. (Janney, Douglas)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Douglas B. Janney, III. NSK America Corporation served on 7/27/2021. (Janney, Douglas)
August 18, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for F. Laurens Brock and Jeremy D. Ray admitted to this court. (dt)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NSK America Corporation. (Brock, F.)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NSK America Corporation.(Brock, F.)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons issued as to NSK America Corporation and Nakanishi, Inc. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.)(dt)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (dt) (dt).
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
June 29, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Douglas B. Janney, III admitted to this court. (dt)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NSK America Corporation and Nakanishi, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3400254), filed by Douglas B. Janney, III. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janney v. NSK America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSK America Corporation
Represented By: F. Laurens Brock
Represented By: Jeremy D. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nakanishi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas B. Janney, III
Represented By: Douglas B. Janney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?