Solomon v. Solomon et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Solomon
Defendant: Angelia Solomon, Kami Abbate, Melanie Hicks, Wynn Hicks, John Does 1 Through 25 and Anna Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv00498
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Aaron Solomon. (Mills, Paige)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Aaron Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Mills, Paige)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wynn Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Gracie Solomon Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wynn Hicks Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Melanie Hicks Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 - Anna Smith Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 5 - Kami Abbate Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 6 - Angelia Solomon Affidavit)(Little, J.)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS returned executed by Aaron Solomon. Angelia Solomon served on 8/18/2021. (Mills, Paige)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: An initial case management conference was scheduled for 8/16/2021 to be held telephonically. Once Defendant Angelia Solomon has been served with process, Plaintiff shall file a return of service. Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 10/20/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. As previously ordered by Judge Campbell (Docket No. #13 ), and confirmed by Plaintiff's counsel, Plaintiff's motion for temporary and permanent injunctive relief (Docket No. #5 ) shall proceed as a motion for a preliminary injunction. By no later than August 20, 2021, Defendants must file any response in opposition to the motion. By no later than August 27, 2021, Plaintiff may file an optional reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/17/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 8/16/2021; ORDER to enter. (Tape #not recorded.) (Hearing lasted :42)(jwc)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Aaron Solomon. (Mills, Paige)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Alex Little, Zachary C. Lawson, Ross M. Johnson, and Kirk D. Catron admitted to this court. (jm)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by Melanie Hicks (Catron, Kirk)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing by Anna Smith Waiver of the Service of Summons (Little, J.)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing by Kami Abbate Waiver of the Service of Summons (Little, J.)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing by Wynn Hicks Waiver of the Service of Summons (Little, J.)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk D. Catron on behalf of Melanie Hicks (Catron, Kirk)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Alex Little on behalf of Kami Abbate, Wynn Hicks, Anna Smith (Little, J.)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 MOTION for Limited and Expedited Discovery and Third-Party Subpoenas without prejudice to refiling after Plaintiff's counsel confers with defense counsel regarding the motion. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/6/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION for Limited and Expedited Discovery and Third-Party Subpoenas filed by Aaron Solomon . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Mills, Paige)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Limited and Expedited Discovery and Third-Party Subpoenas by Aaron Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit B - Instagram Subpoena, #3 Exhibit C - Facebook Subpoena, #4 Exhibit D - Twitter Subpoena, #5 Exhibit E - YouTube Subpoena, #6 Exhibit F - Venmo Subpoena, #7 Exhibit G - GoFundMe Subpoena, #8 Exhibit H - Harris Hicks Subpoena, #9 Exhibit I - Hunter Neilson Subpoena, #10 Exhibit J - James Mayes Subpoena, #11 Exhibit K - Lori Christian Subpoena, #12 Exhibit L - Makenzie Stewart Subpoena, #13 Exhibit M - Michelle Ryan Subpoena)(Mills, Paige)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/30/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons issued as to Kami Abbate, Melanie Hicks, Wynn Hicks, Anna Smith, and Angelia Solomon. (Service copies to be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/16/2021 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Declarations by Aaron Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Aaron Solomon, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Steve Berger, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ronald Blanton, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Lori Cameron, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Scott Erby, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Gary Hathcock, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Dan Huffines, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Robbie Mason, #9 Exhibit I - Declaration of Paige Mills, #10 Exhibit J - Declaration of Pam Stephens)(jm)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary and Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by Aaron Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memo ISO Motion for Injunctive Relief - Screen Shots, #2 Exhibit B to Memo ISO Motion for Injunctive Relief - DCS Letter, #3 Exhibit C to Memo ISO Motion for Injunctive Relief - Chart Lies)(jm)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary and Permanent Injunctive Relief by Aaron Solomon. (jm)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Aaron Solomon. (jm)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (jm)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650- 3401035), filed by Aaron Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Order in Case No. 2019-230J, #3 Exhibit B - Transcript of Proceedings, #4 Exhibit C - Letter to Angelia Solomon, #5 Exhibit D - Letter to Anna Smith, #6 Exhibit E - Letter to Wynn Hicks, #7 Exhibit F - Filed Under Seal)(jm)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Paige Waldrop Mills and Ashleigh D. Karnell admitted to this court. (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. Solomon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelia Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kami Abbate
Represented By: J. Alex Little
Represented By: Ross M. Johnson
Represented By: Zachary C. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Hicks
Represented By: Kirk D. Catron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Hicks
Represented By: J. Alex Little
Represented By: Ross M. Johnson
Represented By: Zachary C. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 Through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Smith
Represented By: J. Alex Little
Represented By: Ross M. Johnson
Represented By: Zachary C. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Solomon
Represented By: Ashleigh D. Karnell
Represented By: Paige Waldrop Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?