Curb Records, Inc. et al v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Curb Records, Inc. and Mike Curb Foundation
Defendant: William Lee, William B. Herbert, IV, Carter Lawrence, Glenn Funk and Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County
Case Number: 3:2021cv00500
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 37 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. (Hickman, J.)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The parties' Motions to Stay #29 , #30 are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 is STAYED and HELD IN ABEYANCE until such time if any that the preliminary injunction in Bongo Productions, LLC, et al. v. Lawrence, et al., No. 3:21-cv-00490 (Docket No. 23), is lifted. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/11/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified text on 8/12/2021 (hb).
August 4, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION to Stay and Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to Preliminary Injunction and File a Responsive Pleading filed by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. (Farringer, John)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Pending before the Court is the unopposed motion of William B. Herbert IV, in his official capacity, to substitute the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County in his place as a named defendant. #26 . Because the motion is represented to be unopposed, it is GRANTED. The Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County shall be substituted in place of William B. Herbert IV, in his official capacity, as a named defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/28/2021. (kc)
July 23, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE by Glenn Funk, Carter Lawrence, William Lee re #29 MOTION to Stay and Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to Preliminary Injunction and File a Responsive Pleading, #30 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Proposed Agreed Order Staying Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Rieger, Alexander)
July 23, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. (Harbison, William)
July 23, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Glenn Funk, Carter Lawrence, William Lee.(Rieger, Alexander)
July 23, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#27 and #30 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
July 21, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Glenn Funk, Carter Lawrence, William Lee. (Rieger, Alexander)
July 21, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay and Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to Preliminary Injunction and File a Responsive Pleading by William B. Herbert, IV. (Roberge, Melissa)
July 21, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Alexander Stuart Rieger admitted to this court. (kc)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Defendant Bill Herbert's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Preliminary Injunction #24 is GRANTED. Accordingly, Herbert shall file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than July 21, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/20/2021. (kc)
July 20, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Stuart Rieger on behalf of Glenn Funk, Carter Lawrence, William Lee (Rieger, Alexander)
July 19, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by William B. Herbert, IV. (Roberge, Melissa)
July 19, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Melissa S. Roberge and Mallory Schneider Ricci admitted to this court. (kc)
July 16, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Glenn Funk, Carter Lawrence, William Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A- Pub Ch 453, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Bongo PI Order, #3 Exhibit Ex C- AP Article)(Rieger, Alexander)
July 16, 2021 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by William B. Herbert, IV. (Roberge, Melissa)
July 16, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa S. Roberge on behalf of William B. Herbert, IV (Roberge, Melissa)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 , #20 , and #21 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Shannon P. Minter, Christopher F. Stoll, and Jennifer L. Levi to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 07/15/2021. (lh)
July 13, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Jennifer L. Levi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3408596) by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Farringer, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney Christopher F. Stoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3408588) by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Farringer, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Shannon P. Minter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3408584) by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Farringer, John)
July 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation re #16 Summons Returned Executed, #15 Summons Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Attorney General Acceptance of Service)(Farringer, John)
July 6, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. William B. Herbert, IV served on 7/2/2021. (Farringer, John)
July 6, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. Glenn Funk served on 7/2/2021. (Farringer, John)
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. Carter Lawrence served on 7/2/2021. (Farringer, John)
July 6, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. William Lee served on 7/2/2021. (Farringer, John)
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appendix)(Harbison, William)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Curb Records, Inc., Mike Curb Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Michael Curb)(Harbison, William)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/30/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mike Curb Foundation. (Harbison, William)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Curb Records, Inc.. (Harbison, William)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Glenn Funk, William B. Herbert, IV, Carter Lawrence, and William Lee. (Service packet held at intake for counsel to pick up.) (kc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 8/17/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mike Curb Foundation. (kc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Curb Records, Inc. (kc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glenn Funk, William B. Herbert, IV, Carter Lawrence, and William Lee (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3401339), filed by Curb Records, Inc. and Mike Curb Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet) (kc)
June 30, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#2 and #3 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (kc)
June 30, 2021 State Bar status verified as active for Shannon P. Minter (CA), Christopher F. Stoll (CA) and Jennifer L. Levi (MA) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
June 30, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for William L. Harbison, Abby Rose Rubenfeld, J. Scott Hickman, Phillip F. Cramer, and John L. Farringer, IV admitted to this court. (kc)
June 30, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Shannon P. Minter, Christopher F. Stoll and Jennifer L. Levi: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/21/2021. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curb Records, Inc. et al v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curb Records, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Levi
Represented By: Phillip F. Cramer
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll
Represented By: Abby Rose Rubenfeld
Represented By: J. Scott Hickman
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Curb Foundation
Represented By: Jennifer L. Levi
Represented By: Phillip F. Cramer
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll
Represented By: Abby Rose Rubenfeld
Represented By: J. Scott Hickman
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lee
Represented By: Alexander Stuart Rieger
Represented By: Rainey A. Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Herbert, IV
Represented By: Mallory Schneider Ricci
Represented By: Melissa S. Roberge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Lawrence
Represented By: Alexander Stuart Rieger
Represented By: Rainey A. Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Funk
Represented By: Alexander Stuart Rieger
Represented By: Rainey A. Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County
Represented By: Mallory Schneider Ricci
Represented By: Melissa S. Roberge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?