Wolfe et al v. Kohl's, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erika Wolfe and Rick Wolfe
Defendant: Kohl's, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00528
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar the Case Management Conference set for September 14, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby RESET for September 15, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. The parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please contact the chambers at 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/7/2021. (jm)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Erika Wolfe. (Olson, Peter)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Kohl's, Inc..(Walthart, Brian)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kohl's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment)(Walthart, Brian)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/13/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/14/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (jm)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kohl's, Inc. from from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number CC-21-CV-1055. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650- 3407752) (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Complaint) (jm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2021: #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (jm).
July 12, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brian F. Walthart and Peter M. Olson admitted to this court. (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe et al v. Kohl's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Wolfe
Represented By: Peter M. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Wolfe
Represented By: Peter M. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's, Inc.
Represented By: Brian F. Walthart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?