Tria v. Allen et al
Plaintiff: Sherry Tria
Defendant: Barbara Allen individually and d/b/a Printers of Art, Harold R. Lovell individually and d/b/a H.R. Lovell Gallery, Maria Cherry Gallery, Maria Cherry and HR Lovell Gallery
Case Number: 3:2021cv00557
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: On September 9, 2021, counsel filed a joint motion to continue the initial case management conference. (Doc. No. #24 ). The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to October 5, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/13/2021.(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
September 13, 2021 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 10/5/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
September 10, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Sherry Tria. (Shrum, Barry)
September 10, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#23 : The filing made at DE #23 is DISREGARDED. Counsel who signed this pleading shall re-file this document using his or her own CM/ECF filing credentials. (ln)
September 9, 2021 Filing 23 ****DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE.**** Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Sherry Tria. (Rigler, Cheshire) Modified on 9/10/2021 (ln).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: On September 7, 2021, Defendant Barbara Allen filed a motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. #20 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/8/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) Modified on 9/9/2021 (mg).
September 7, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Barbara Allen . (Sanders, Richard)
September 7, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Barbara Allen. (Sanders, Richard)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The motion #16 for extension of time to answer is GRANTED. Barbara Allen's answer due 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/17/2021. (ln)
August 17, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by Sherry Tria. HR Lovell served on 8/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Service)(Shrum, Barry)
August 17, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed by Sherry Tria. Harold R. Lovell Gallery served on 8/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Service)(Shrum, Barry)
August 17, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard G. Sanders, Jr admitted to this court. (ln)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Barbara Allen. (Sanders, Richard)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard G. Sanders, Jr on behalf of Barbara Allen (Sanders, Richard)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Sherry Tria. Maria Cherry Gallery served on 7/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Process Server)(Shrum, Barry)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Sherry Tria. Maria Cherry served on 7/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Process Server)(Shrum, Barry)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Sherry Tria. Barbara Allen served on 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Process Server)(Shrum, Barry)
August 3, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 , #10 , #11 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the documents. Please include the Return Copy of the issued Summons for each party. (ln)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 ****DISREGARD. WRONG EVENT USED.**** AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Maria Cherry Gallery on 07/28/2021, filed by Sherry Tria. (Shrum, Barry) Modified on 8/3/2021 (ln).
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 ****DISREGARD. WRONG EVENT USED.**** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherry Tria , AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Maria Cherry on 07/28/2021, filed by Sherry Tria. (Shrum, Barry) Modified on 8/3/2021 (ln).
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 ****DISREGARD. WRONG EVENT USED.**** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherry Tria on Def. Barbara Allen (Shrum, Barry) Modified on 8/3/2021 (ln).
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sherry Tria. (Shrum, Barry)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/27/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Barbara Allen, Maria Cherry, Harold R. Lovell (and H.R. Lovell Gallery), and Maria Cherry Gallery. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (ln)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/15/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
July 23, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Cheshire Rigler not admitted to this court. (ln)
July 23, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Barry Neil Shrum admitted to this court. (ln)
July 23, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Cheshire Rigler: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 8/13/2021. (ln)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barbara Allen, Maria Cherry, Harold R. Lovell, and Maria Cherry Gallery (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3414902) filed by Sherry Tria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyrighted Photographs, #2 Exhibit B - Registration Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - Infringing Works, #4 Exhibit D - Allen Business Card, #5 Exhibit E - Misleading Authenticity Certificate, #6 Exhibit F -Infringing Website, #7 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tria v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Tria
Represented By: Barry Neil Shrum
Represented By: Cheshire Rigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Allen individually and d/b/a Printers of Art
Represented By: Richard G. Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold R. Lovell individually and d/b/a H.R. Lovell Gallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Cherry Gallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HR Lovell Gallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?