Kerns v. Grandmama's House of Preschool and Child Development, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aislynn Kerns
Defendant: Grandmamas House of Preschool and Child Development, Inc., Jeffrey Bailey Stanfill, Bridgette Stanfill and Grandmama's House of Preschool and Child Development, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00569
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Grandmama's House of Preschool and Child Development, Inc., Bridgette Stanfill, and Jeffrey Bailey Stanfill answer due 10/8/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/24/2021. (mg)
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Grandmama's House of Preschool and Child Development, Inc., Bridgette Stanfill, Jeffrey Bailey Stanfill. (Hart, Elizabeth)
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth G. Hart on behalf of All Defendants (Hart, Elizabeth)
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L. Swafford on behalf of All Defendants (Swafford, Tara)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Swafford on behalf of All Defendants (Swafford, Thomas)
September 24, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas Anthony Swafford, Tara L. Swafford, Elizabeth G. Hart admitted to this court. (mg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Motion #9 GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESET for 10/25/2021 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/2/2021. (mg)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Aislynn Kerns. (Turner, Robert)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Aislynn Kerns. All Defendants. (Turner, Robert)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing by Aislynn Kerns of Sabrina Moreland Consent to Join (Turner, Robert)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2021 at 02:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Grandmamas House of Preschool and Child Development, Inc., Bridgette Stanfill, Jeffrey Bailey Stanfill. Service copies will be returned to counsel (J. Bryant) by mail. (mg)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grandmamas House of Preschool and Child Development, Inc., Bridgette Stanfill, Jeffrey Bailey Stanfill (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3417056), filed by Aislynn Kerns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kerns Consent to Join, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
July 27, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Russ Bryant, Robert E. Turner, IV, Robert E. Morelli, III, Nina H. Parsley admitted to this court. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerns v. Grandmama's House of Preschool and Child Development, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aislynn Kerns
Represented By: J. Russ Bryant
Represented By: Nina H. Parsley
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Represented By: Robert E. Turner, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grandmamas House of Preschool and Child Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Bailey Stanfill
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Hart
Represented By: Tara L. Swafford
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgette Stanfill
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Hart
Represented By: Tara L. Swafford
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grandmama's House of Preschool and Child Development, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Hart
Represented By: Tara L. Swafford
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?