Cardinale et al v. Owen et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Cardinale and Morgan Taylor Reid
Defendant: Joshua Ryan Owen, Big Loud Records, LLC, Benjy Lashar Davis, McCarty & Blake, LLC doing business as Plaid Flag Music, Joe David Hoogerhyde, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC doing business as Sony ATV Tree Publishing, Neil Allen Medley and Horipro Entertainment Group, Inc. doing business as Dixie Stars Music doing business as Son of a Carl Music
Case Number: 3:2021cv00577
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS returned executed by Morgan Taylor Reid, Alexander Cardinale. Joshua Ryan Owen served on 9/21/2021. (Busch, Richard)
September 23, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS returned executed by Morgan Taylor Reid, Alexander Cardinale. Big Loud Records, LLC served on 9/13/2021. (Busch, Richard)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: An initial case management conference is scheduled in this case for Tuesday, October 5, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. The parties are required to prepare and file a proposed joint initial case management order in advance of the initial case management conference (and to send a copy in Word format to the Courtroom Deputy) as previously instructed. Due to unforeseen circumstances, Magistrate Judge Holmes will not be able to conduct the initial case management conference. Magistrate Judge Holmes will, instead, enter the proposed initial case management order (the "ICMO"), with modifications to conform to the Court's preferred case management schedule. If the proposed ICMO is submitted by all parties, counsel may remove the initial case management conference from their calendars. When the ICMO is entered, counsel must follow the Clerk's instructions in bold, red, and all caps to open the PDF and read it carefully for Magistrate Judge Holmes' modifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/21/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
September 14, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Morgan Taylor Reid, Alexander Cardinale. Neil Allen Medley waiver sent on 8/25/2021. (Busch, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Morgan Taylor Reid, Alexander Cardinale. McCarty & Blake, LLC waiver sent on 8/25/2021. (Busch, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Morgan Taylor Reid, Alexander Cardinale. Joe David Hoogerhyde waiver sent on 8/25/2021. (Busch, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Morgan Taylor Reid, Alexander Cardinale. Benjy Lashar Davis waiver sent on 8/25/2021. (Busch, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Morgan Taylor Reid, Alexander Cardinale. Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC waiver sent on 8/25/2021. (Busch, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Morgan Taylor Reid, Alexander Cardinale. Horipro Entertainment Group, Inc. waiver sent on 8/25/2021. (Busch, Richard)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Morgan Taylor Reid re #13 Notice of Change of Address (Davis, Andrew)
September 13, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#13 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not sign the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ln)
September 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard S. Busch (Busch, Richard)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 Summons issued as to Big Loud Records, LLC and Joshua Ryan Owen. Service copies will be returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to JOSHUA RYAN OWEN p/k/a JAKE OWEN. (Busch, Richard)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to BIG LOUD RECORDS, LLC. (Busch, Richard)
August 26, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re DE #8 , #9 : The Summons forms are not complete. Please provide an address for each Defendant and re-file the completed documents. (ln)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 ****DISREGARD. DOCUMENT INCOMPLETE. ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE.**** NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to JOSHUA RYAN OWEN p/k/a JAKE OWEN. (Busch, Richard) Modified on 8/26/2021 (ln).
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 ****DISREGARD. DOCUMENT INCOMPLETE. ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE.**** NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to BIG LOUD RECORDS, LLC. (Busch, Richard) Modified on 8/26/2021 (ln).
July 30, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Virginia M. King admitted to this court. (ln)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/29/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia M. King on behalf of All Plaintiffs (King, Virginia)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/5/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
July 28, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard S. Busch and Andrew Hunt Davis admitted to this court. (ln)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big Loud Records, LLC, Benjy Lashar Davis, Joe David Hoogerhyde, Horipro Entertainment Group, Inc., McCarty & Blake, LLC, Neil Allen Medley, Joshua Ryan Owen, and Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3417598) filed by Morgan Taylor Reid and Alexander Cardinale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet) (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinale et al v. Owen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Cardinale
Represented By: Andrew Hunt Davis
Represented By: Richard S. Busch
Represented By: Virginia M. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Taylor Reid
Represented By: Andrew Hunt Davis
Represented By: Richard S. Busch
Represented By: Virginia M. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Ryan Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Loud Records, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjy Lashar Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty & Blake, LLC doing business as Plaid Flag Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe David Hoogerhyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC doing business as Sony ATV Tree Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Allen Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horipro Entertainment Group, Inc. doing business as Dixie Stars Music doing business as Son of a Carl Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?