Does #1 - #8 v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: John Doe #1
Defendant: William B. Lee and David B. Rausch
Consolidated Plaintiff: John Doe #3, John Doe #2, John Doe #5, John Doe #7, John Doe #4, John Doe #6, John Doe #8 and John Doe #9
Case Number: 3:2021cv00590
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: #62 Motion GRANTED. Extension to 10/15/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/28/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 27, 2021 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 Response to Motion, #45 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (AMENDED) by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7, John Doe #9. (Adams, Walter)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting re #59 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaints. William B. Lee answer due 11/4/2021; David B. Rausch answer due 11/4/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/24/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (hb).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/24/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 24, 2021 Filing 59 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaints by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. (Mitchell, Robert)
September 24, 2021 Filing 58 Sealed Document Exhibit E to Siedentop Affidavit filed by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. (Mitchell, Robert)
September 24, 2021 Filing 57 Sealed Document Exhibit D to Siedentop Affidavit filed by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. (Mitchell, Robert)
September 24, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. (Mitchell, Robert)
September 24, 2021 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (AMENDED) filed by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Smitherman Declaration, #2 Exhibit Siedentop Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Grady Declaration, #4 Exhibit Kerley Declaration)(Mitchell, Robert)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2021. (mg)
September 3, 2021 Filing 53 Sealed Document Notice of Plaintiffs' Full Names and Birthdates filed by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7, John Doe #9. (Adams, Walter)
September 3, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Notice of Plaintiffs' Full Names and Birthdates by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7, John Doe #9. (Adams, Walter)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SECOND AMENDED JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/11/2022; Discovery due by 4/15/2022; and Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2022. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/2/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/2/2021. (mg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Request #44 GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2021. (mg)
September 2, 2021 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Support of #45 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (AMENDED) filed by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7, John Doe #9 . (Adams, Walter)
September 2, 2021 Filing 47 Sealed Document Declaration of Doe #9 in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe #9. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Doe #9)(Adams, Walter)
September 2, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Declaration of Doe #9 in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe #9. (Adams, Walter)
September 2, 2021 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (AMENDED) by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7, John Doe #9. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Doe #9 REDACTED)(Adams, Walter)
September 2, 2021 Filing 44 JOINDER of Plaintiff Doe #9 to #6 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order filed by John Doe #9. (Adams, Walter) Modified on 9/3/2021 to properly identify document and term as a motion. (ds)
September 2, 2021 Filing 43 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Second Amended filed by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7, John Doe #9. (Adams, Walter)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Bench Trial is set for 2/21/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 2/14/2023. Witness List due by 2/14/2023. Pretrial Conference is set for 2/17/2023 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/14/2023. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/2/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: At the initial case management conference held in these consolidated cases on September 1,2021, the plaintiffs agreed to limit their request for a preliminary injunction to relief addressed just to the nine individual plaintiffs in this consolidated case, rather than requesting relief for all persons from the Tennessee SORA statutory scheme. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file a revised Motion for Preliminary Injunction that makes their request for relief clear. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/2/2021. (kc)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Case number 3:21-cv-0671 is related and consolidated for case management, discovery and pretrial motions. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/2/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Declarations Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/1/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Declaration Under Seal and Supporting Memorandum. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/1/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 1, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference held on 9/1/2021. Revised Case management order to be refiled. (Hearing lasted :25)(kb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 37 Sealed Document Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Doe #1, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Doe #2, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Doe #3, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Doe #4, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Doe #5, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Doe #6, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Doe #7, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Doe #8)(Adams, Walter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7. (Adams, Walter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Doe #1 REDACTED, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Doe #2 REDACTED, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Doe #3 REDACTED, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Doe #4 REDACTED, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Doe #5 REDACTED, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Doe #6 REDACTED, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Doe #7 REDACTED, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Doe #8 REDACTED)(Adams, Walter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 34 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (AMENDED) filed by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7. (Adams, Walter)
August 25, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mallory K. Schiller admitted to this court. (kc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Mallory K. Schiller on behalf of William B. Lee, David B. Rausch (Schiller, Mallory)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and Granting Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/24/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Upon the reassignment of this consolidated case to Judge Trauger (Doc. No. 30), it is hereby ORDERED that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is hereby WITHDRAWN, and counsel for the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an initial case management conference before Judge Trauger on Wednesday, September 1, 2021, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/24/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, these actions are transferred to Judge Aleta A. Trauger as "Related Cases" to Civil Action No. 3:21-cv-00028. Case reassigned to District Judge Aleta A. Trauger for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/24/2021. (vh)
August 23, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Cody N. Brandon and Miranda H. Jones admitted to this court. (kc)
August 23, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Courtney Orr admitted to this court. (kc)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The telephone conference set on August 23, 2021, at 3:30 p.m. is CANCELLED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/20/2021. (kc)
August 20, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Orr on behalf of William B. Lee, David B. Rausch (Orr, Courtney)
August 19, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Miranda H. Jones on behalf of William B. Lee, David B. Rausch (Jones, Miranda)
August 19, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody N. Brandon on behalf of William B. Lee, David B. Rausch (Brandon, Cody)
August 19, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 8/19/2021. (Hearing lasted 01:05)(sd)
August 18, 2021 Filing 25 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #8, John Doe #7. (Adams, Walter)
August 18, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert W. Mitchell admitted to this court. (kc)
August 16, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch re #6 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re #1 Complaint NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (Mitchell, Robert)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints #1 . Answers due 10/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/16/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 8/16/2021 (kc).
August 16, 2021 Reset Deadlines per Order #23 : William B. Lee answer due 10/4/2021 and David B. Rausch answer due 10/4/2021. (kc)
August 13, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. (Mitchell, Robert)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Pursuant to Chief Judge Crenshaw's August 12, 2021 order (Doc. No. #19 ), the initial case management conference in these consolidated matters is RESET for August 19, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/13/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
August 13, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Mitchell on behalf of William B. Lee, David B. Rausch (Mitchell, Robert)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. #12 . This case is set for an Initial Case Management Conference on September 30, 2021 before United States Magistrate Judge Newbern. #10 . If possible, the initial case management conference should be expedited. At the Conference, the parties shall discuss with the Magistrate Judge the extent of the limited discovery necessary to prepare for a hearing on the motion. With the Magistrate Judge's approval, the parties shall set an agreed-upon briefing schedule so that the motion is briefed after the limited discovery is completed and give the Court a target Preliminary Injunction hearing date. The parties should also estimate the length of the hearing. The parties are further advised that the Court requires the parties to depose any witnesses that will testify at the hearing at least seven (7) days prior to the hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/11/2021. (kc)
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by John Doe #1. All Defendants. (Yarbrough, Edward)
August 10, 2021 Filing 17 Sealed Document Corrected Notice of Filing of Doe #1's Declaration with Exhibit 1 thereto filed by John Doe #1. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Doe #1's Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Attachment Exhibit 1 to Doe #1's Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Adams, Walter)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Before the Court are Plaintiffs' Motions to Deem Cases Related, Reassign, and Consolidate. (Doc. No. #8 in Case No. 3:21-cv-00590; Doc. No. 7 in Case No. 3:21-cv-00593; Doc. No. 7 in Case No. 3:21-cv-00594). These related cases involve common questions of law and fact along with the same Defendants. Accordingly, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), the Motions are GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that these cases be CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, except for trial, which is reserved. The consolidated cases shall proceed under Case No. 3:21-cv-00590. All future filings shall be made in the lead case only, No. 3:21-cv-00590. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/10/2021. (kc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe #1 . (Adams, Walter)
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 Sealed Document Doe #1's Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe #1. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Doe #1's Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Adams, Walter)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe #1. (Adams, Walter)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe #1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Doe #1 (REDACTED))(Adams, Walter)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/4/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 9/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION to Deem Cases Related, Reassign, and Consolidate re #1 Complaint filed by John Doe #1 . (Adams, Walter)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Deem Cases Related, Reassign, and Consolidate re #1 Complaint by John Doe #1. (Adams, Walter)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re #1 Complaint filed by John Doe #1 . (Adams, Walter)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re #1 Complaint by John Doe #1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Order)(Adams, Walter)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. Service copies will be picked up by counsel at Intake between the hours of 10:00 a.m. - 2:00 p.m. (mg)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against William B. Lee, David B. Rausch (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3419970), filed by John Doe #1. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) Modified on 7/30/2021 (mg).
July 30, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Edward M. Yarbrough, Jonathan P. Farmer, Walter Justin Adams admitted to this court. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Does #1 - #8 v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #1
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Lee
Represented By: Cody N. Brandon
Represented By: Courtney Orr
Represented By: Mallory K. Schiller
Represented By: Miranda H. Jones
Represented By: Robert W. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Rausch
Represented By: Cody N. Brandon
Represented By: Courtney Orr
Represented By: Mallory K. Schiller
Represented By: Miranda H. Jones
Represented By: Robert W. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Doe #3
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Doe #2
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Doe #5
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Doe #7
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Doe #4
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Doe #6
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Doe #8
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Doe #9
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?