Doe #5 v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: John Doe #5
Defendant: William B. Lee and David B. Rausch
Case Number: 3:2021cv00596
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Newbern per DE#31 in Lead case 3:21-cv-0590. (bs)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, these actions are transferred to Judge Aleta A. Trauger as "Related Cases" to Civil Action No. 3:21-cv-00028. Case reassigned to District Judge Aleta A. Trauger for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/24/2021. (vh)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by John Doe #5. Governor Lee served through TN AG's Office 08/03/2021. Director Rausch served through TN AG's Office 08/03/2021. (Yarbrough, Edward) Modified service details on 8/12/2021 (ln).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Motion to Deem Cases Related, Reassign, and Consolidate #10 is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that these cases be CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, except for trial, which is reserved. The consolidated cases shall proceed under Case No. 3:21-cv-00590. All future filings shall be made in the lead case only, No. 3:21-cv-00590. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/10/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/4/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk transfer this case to United States District Judge Waverly Crenshaw, as it is related to an earlier filed case (3:21-cv-00590) that is assigned to him. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/3/2021. (ln)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Deem Cases Related, Reassign, and Consolidate re #1 Complaint filed by John Doe #5 . (Adams, Walter)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Deem Cases Related, Reassign, and Consolidate re #1 Complaint by John Doe #5. (Adams, Walter)
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 ****DISREGARD. ICMC RESET BELOW PER CHAMBERS.**** NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/29/2021 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln) Modified on 8/3/2021 (ln).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Because there are other cases pending before Magistrate Judge Alistair E. Newbern with the same Plaintiff's attorneys and substantially similar claims, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is transferred to Judge Newbern for all further case management and other matters, including an initial case management conference1, and there will be no further proceedings before the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/2/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re #1 Complaint filed by John Doe #5 . (Adams, Walter)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re #1 Complaint by John Doe #5. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Order)(Adams, Walter)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/2/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons issued as to William B. Lee and David B. Rausch. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (ln)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against William B. Lee and David B. Rausch (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3420041) filed by John Doe #5. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
July 30, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Edward M. Yarbrough, Jonathan P. Farmer, and Walter Justin Adams admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe #5 v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #5
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Rausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?