Burdick v. Frink
Defendant: Trousdale Turner Correcitional Complex
Petitioner: Robert Jason Burdick
Respondent: Warden Martin Frink
Case Number: 3:2021cv00602
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Respondent is DIRECTED to file an Answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Petition #1 , the supporting Memorandum #2 , and the Amended Petition #11 in accordance with Habeas Rule 5 within 30 DAYS of the date this Order is entered on the docket. By the same date, Respondent shall also file the complete state court record relevant to this matter. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/23/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED PETITION (signed) against Martin Frink, filed by Robert Jason Burdick. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Note)(kc)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Motion to Amend #7 will be GRANTED, but the Amended Petition is not properly signed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to return the Amended Petition #8 to Petitioner. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of the Petition and this Order on Respondent and the Attorney General of Tennessee. See Habeas Rule 4. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/13/2021. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail. Amended Petition was also returned to Petitioner for signature. Order and Petition forwarded to Respondent and Attorney General's office by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 9/13/2021 (kc). Modified on 9/24/2021 (kc).
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 RECEIPT #34675063552 in the amount of $5.00 posted by Robert Jason Burdick re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (kc)
August 17, 2021 A personal check in the amount of $5.00 was received this date as payment of the filing fee by Mrs. Robert L. Burdick. The check will be returned by the Financial Department. (kc)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof against Martin Frink, filed by Robert Jason Burdick. (kc)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Robert Jason Burdick. (kc)
August 11, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Matthew Stahl admitted to this court. (kc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Matthew Stahl on behalf of Martin Frink (Stahl, Michael)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To proceed in this action, Petitioner MUST either pay the $5 filing fee or submit a properly completed application to proceed as a pauper. 28 U.S.C. 1914(a); Habeas Rule 3(a). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Petitioner a blank application to proceed as a pauper (short form). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/9/2021. (xc: Order and IFP short form forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
August 5, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert Jason Burdick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (kc)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert Jason Burdick.(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burdick v. Frink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Jason Burdick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trousdale Turner Correcitional Complex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Martin Frink
Represented By: Michael Matthew Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?