Carter v. Slatery
Petitioner: Timothy Damon Carter
Respondent: Herbert H. Slatery, III
Case Number: 3:2021cv00603
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("Inmate Paroled/Discharged") re Docket Annotation dated 08/05/2021. Mail sent to Timothy Damon Carter. (ln)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Timothy Damon Carter, a state prisoner, has a pro se habeas corpus action filed under 28 U.S.C. 2254 already pending in this court, challenging the judgment in Davidson County Criminal Court Case No. 2012-B-1221. See Carter v. Slatery, No. 3:20-cv-00483. In that case, the court ordered Carter to file an amended petition on or before August 4, 2021. Id., No. 3:20-cv-00483, Doc. No. 36 (M.D. Tenn. July 12, 2021). On August 4, the court received a habeas corpus petition from Carter challenging the same Davidson County judgment. (See Doc. No. #1 at 1.) This initiated the opening of a new case. However, it is apparent that Carter intended the petition received on August 4 to serve as the amended petition in his pre-existing habeas corpus action. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Doc. No. #1 , along with all of the attachments, as an Amended Petition in Case No. 3:20-cv-00483, and then ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Carter is reminded that, for all filings related to his habeas corpus action challenging the judgment in Davidson County Criminal Court Case No. 2012-B-1221, Carter MUST include the proper case number, No. 3:20-cv-00483. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/9/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
August 5, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ln)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Timothy Damon Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ground One, #2 Exhibit B - Ground Two, #3 Exhibit C - Ground Three, #4 Exhibit D - Ground Four, #5 Exhibit E - Ground Five, #6 Exhibit F - Ground Six, #7 Exhibit 1 - Supreme Court Filings, #8 Exhibit 2 - 2012 Calendar, #9 Exhibit 3 - LaVergne Police Dept. Activity Report, #10 Exhibit 4 - State Warrant GS503475, #11 Exhibit 5 - State Warrant GS503476, #12 Exhibit 6 - Criminal Case Summary, #13 Exhibit 7 - Appendix 2, #14 Exhibit 8 - Public Record Request Response Form, #15 Exhibit 9 - TN Comptroller-Open Records Counsel, #16 Exhibit 10 - LaVergne Police Dept. Activity Report, #17 Exhibit 11 - Consumer Assistance Program Correspondence, #18 Exhibit 12 - Consumer Assistance Program Correspondence, #19 Exhibit 13 - Affidavit of Graham Prichard, #20 Exhibit 14 - Correspondence)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Slatery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Damon Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Herbert H. Slatery, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?