Family Christian Fellowship v. Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Plaintiff: Family Christian Fellowship doing business as Family Christian Academy
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Case Number: 3:2021cv00616
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Family Christian Fellowship. (Prince, Raymond)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Carpenter, Brigid)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina.(Carpenter, Brigid)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Family Christian Fellowship. (Prince, Raymond)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/9/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
August 9, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Raymond G. Prince, Brigid M. Carpenter, John S. Hicks, and Paul T. Madden admitted to this court. (ln)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina from Circuit Court for Davidson County, case number 21C952. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0650-3424628). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint pp. 1-62, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint pp. 63-110, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint pp.111-150, #4 Exhibit 1 - Complaint pp. 151-190, #5 Exhibit 1 - Complaint pp. 191-230, #6 Exhibit 1 - Complaint pp. 231-270, #7 Exhibit 1 - Complaint pp. 271-315, #8 Exhibit 1 - Complaint pp. 316-364, #9 Exhibit 2 - State Court Notice, #10 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Family Christian Fellowship v. Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Christian Fellowship doing business as Family Christian Academy
Represented By: Raymond G. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: John S. Hicks
Represented By: Paul T. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?