Maras v. US Dominion, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terpsehore Maras
Defendant: US Dominion, Inc., Dominion Voting Systems, Inc. and Dominion Voting Systems Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00636
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for October 18, 2021 is RESET for Wednesday, November 10, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/14/2021. (ds)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Terpsehore Maras. Dominion Voting Systems Corporation served on 10/4/2021. Dominion Voting Systems, Inc. served on 10/4/2021. US Dominion, Inc. was served on 10/4/2021. (Newman, Russell) Modified text and service info on 10/13/2021 (ln).
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Affiliation and Address by Terpsehore Maras (Newman, Russell)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing by Terpsehore Maras re #1 Complaint, Verification (Newman, Russell)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Dominion Voting Systems Corporation, Dominion Voting Systems, Inc., and US Dominion, Inc. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (ln)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2021 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 ****DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR.**** NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge., NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln) Modified on 8/17/2021 (ln).
August 17, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Russell A. Newman admitted to this court. (ln)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dominion Voting Systems Corporation, Dominion Voting Systems, Inc., and US Dominion, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3430506) filed by Terpsehore Maras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Arizona Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit and Exhibit 13 to Arizona Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - District of Columbia Complaint, #5 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maras v. US Dominion, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terpsehore Maras
Represented By: Russell A. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Dominion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Voting Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?