Lyndon Southern Insurance Company et al v. Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.
Petitioner: Lyndon Southern Insurance Company and Insurance Company of the South
Respondent: Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00652
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
2 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 39 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Insurance Company of the South, Lyndon Southern Insurance Company. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award. #1 . Replies due by 10/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/18/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 18, 2021 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Insurance Company of the South, Lyndon Southern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The motions for leave to file under seal (Doc. Nos. #6 and #28 are DENIED without prejudice to refiling pursuant to the standards set forth in Shane Grp., Inc., 825 F.3d at 305-06 and in Beauchamp, 658 Fed. Appx. at 207 and in accordance with Local Rule 5.03. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/13/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #24 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition. Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc. answer due 10/11/2021. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/12/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Main Document 35 replaced on 10/13/2021) (kc).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #25 and #26 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Beth-Ann Schulman and Michael J. Childers to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/12/2021. (lh)
October 12, 2021 FL State Bar status verified as active for Beth-Ann Schulman and Michael J. Childers not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
October 11, 2021 Filing 33 Sealed Document Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.'s Response to Lyndon's Motion to Confirm Arbitral Award filed by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PAA with Amendment, #2 Exhibit B - CAA with Amendment, #3 Exhibit C - Lyndon Position Statement, #4 Exhibit D - Panel Order 6, #5 Exhibit E - Jupiter Trial Brief, #6 Exhibit F - Panel Order 4, #7 Exhibit G - Jupiter's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Exhibit H - Joe Alberti Transcript)(McKelvey, Terrence)
October 11, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc..(McKelvey, Terrence)
October 11, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Strike Petitioners' Prayer for Attorneys' Fees and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (McKelvey, Terrence)
October 11, 2021 Filing 30 Sealed Document Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.'s Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PAA with Amendment, #2 Exhibit B - CAA with Amendment, #3 Exhibit C - Lyndon Position Statement, #4 Exhibit D - Panel Order 6, #5 Exhibit E - Jupiter Trial Brief, #6 Exhibit F - Panel Order 4, #7 Exhibit G - Jupiter's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Exhibit H - Joe Alberti Transcript)(McKelvey, Terrence)
October 11, 2021 Filing 29 Sealed Document Motion to File Under Seal with Exhibit filed by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Hearing Transcript)(McKelvey, Terrence)
October 11, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (McKelvey, Terrence)
October 11, 2021 Filing 27 COUNTERCLAIM Petition to Vacate Final Arbitration Award against Insurance Company of the South, Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, filed by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc..(McKelvey, Terrence)
October 11, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for attorney Michael J. Childers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3463848) by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Michael J. Childers, #2 Attachment Childers Certificate of Good Standing)(McKelvey, Terrence)
October 11, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney Beth-Ann Schulman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3463847) by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Beth-Ann Schulman, #2 Attachment Schulman Certificate of Good Standing)(McKelvey, Terrence)
October 1, 2021 Filing 24 Second Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, #1 Complaint, Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (Callen, Jason) Modified on 10/13/2021 (kc).
September 17, 2021 Filing 23 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (McKelvey, Terrence)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition. Response due 10/4/2021. By Order entered September 2, 2021, Docket Entry No. #17 , the Court directed that the parties prepare and file a joint proposed scheduling order no later than September 21, 2021. To allow for the additional time for Respondent's response, that deadline is EXTENDED to October 21, 2021. See instructions in Docket Entry No. #17 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/16/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 16, 2021 Reset Deadline per Order #22 : Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc. answer due 10/4/202. (kc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (McKelvey, Terrence)
September 10, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS returned executed by Lyndon Southern Insurance Company. Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc. served on 8/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Process Server)(Norred, Robert)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Jeffrey Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/10/2021.(lh)
September 10, 2021 Georgia Bar status verified as active for Jeffrey H. Fisher not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (lh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3445545) by Insurance Company of the South, Lyndon Southern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#16 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the document with the Return on Summons being the main document and the Affidavit being an attachment. (kc)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(c)(6), this case is exempt from mandatory case management. Nevertheless, the Court intends to enter a scheduling order. The proposed scheduling order must be submitted by no later than September 21, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/2/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and Petition and supporting documents served on Brian Brown, RA for Jupiter General Agency, Inc. on August 28, 2021, filed by Lyndon Southern Insurance Company. (Norred, Robert)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this action is transferred to Judge William L. Campbell, Jr. as a "Related Case" to Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-01037. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/31/2021. (kc)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Following consultation with Judge Holmes, the instant matter is TRANSFERRED to Judge Holmes for all Magistrate Judge proceedings and responsibilities. The October 19, 2021 Initial Case Management Conference is CANCELLED. An Initial Case Management Conference will be scheduled by Judge Holmes. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/27/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 Summons issued as to Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 10/19/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 Sealed Document Exhibit D to Fisher Declaration and Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Lyndon Southern Insurance Company. (Norred, Robert)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 Sealed Document Exhibit C to Fisher Declaration and Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Lyndon Southern Insurance Company. (Norred, Robert)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal of Lyndon Southern Insurance Co & Ins. Co. of the South by Lyndon Southern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C Slipsheet Sealed Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D Slipsheet Sealed Exhibit)(Norred, Robert)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement Lyndon's Motion to Confirm Arbitral Award by Lyndon Southern Insurance Company. (Norred, Robert)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.. (Norred, Robert)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Insurance Company of the South. (kc)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lyndon Southern Insurance Company. (kc)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRAL AWARD against Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503434724), filed by Lyndon Southern Insurance Company and Insurance Company of the South. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Jeffrey Fisher, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) Modified on 8/23/2021 (kc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyndon Southern Insurance Company et al v. Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lyndon Southern Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Fischer
Represented By: Joe P. Reynolds
Represented By: Robert G. Norred, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Insurance Company of the South
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Fischer
Represented By: Joe P. Reynolds
Represented By: Robert G. Norred, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jupiter Managing General Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Beth-Ann Schulman
Represented By: Jason W. Callen
Represented By: Michael J. Childers
Represented By: Terrence M. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?