Jennings v. Fly et al
Plaintiff: Rashaad Jennings
Defendant: Chris Fly and Mike Fitzhugh
Case Number: 3:2021cv00658
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court will disregard the filing by Mr. Mhanna. (Doc. No. #1 ). For Petitioner to proceed, however, he must provide the Court with more information. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Petitioner a form for filing a habeas corpus petition under U.S.C. 2254. Petitioner SHALL complete the form, sign it, date it, and return it to the Court within 30 days of entry of this Order. The Court needs this additional information in order to evaluate Petitioner's claims. No additional fee is required. In addition, the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Petitioner the Information Sheet entitled "How to Begin a 2254 Action (Prisoner)" for Petitioner's convenience. Should Petitioner require additional time to comply with the Court's instructions, he may request an extension by doing so in writing prior to the expiration of the 30 day period. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/6/2021. (xc:Pro se party sent this order, a form for filing a habeas corpus petition under U.S.C. 2254, and Information Sheet entitled How to Begin a 2254 Action (Prisoner) by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 RECEIPT #34675063600 in the amount of $5.00 posted by Rashaad Jennings re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jm)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 Writ of Habeas Corpus by Rashaad Jennings. (jm)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (jm)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Rashaad Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Peitition for Relief From a Conviction or Sentence By a Person in State Custody Instructions, #2 Attachment Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Subjiciendum, #3 Exhibit 1 - Supporting Documentation, #4 Exhibit 2 - Supporting Documentation, #5 Exhibit 3 - Supporting Documentation, #6 Exhibit 4 - Supporting Documentation, #7 Exhibit 5 - Supporting Documentation, #8 Exhibit 6 - Supporting Documentation, #9 Exhibit 7 - Supporting Documentation, #10 Exhibit 8 - Supporting Documentation, #11 Exhibit 9 - Supporting Documentation)(jm)
August 24, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. Fly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashaad Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Fly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Fitzhugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?