Doe #9 v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: John Doe #9
Defendant: William B. Lee and David B. Rausch
Case Number: 3:2021cv00671
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by John Doe #9. All Defendants. (Adams, Walter)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/2/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 2, 2021 This case was consolidated this date and all future filings shall be made in lead case number 3:21-cv-0590. (kc)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by John Doe #9. (Adams, Walter)
September 1, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference held on 9/1/2021. This case will be consolidated with 3:21-cv-590. (Hearing lasted :10)(kb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons issued as to William B. Lee and David B. Rausch. Service copies will be picked up by counsel at Intake between the hours of 10:00 a.m. - 2:00 p.m. (ln)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
August 30, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Edward M. Yarbrough, Jonathan P. Farmer, and Walter Justin Adams admitted to this court. (ln)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against William B. Lee and David B. Rausch (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3438117) filed by John Doe #9. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe #9 v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #9
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Rausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?