Ratanavong v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kristine Ratanavong
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2021cv00707
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Bryan Konoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/21/2021.(lh)
September 20, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Anthony Walker admitted to this court. (ln)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Bryan Konoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3449905) by Kristine Ratanavong. (Attachments: #1 Attachment affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed order)(Walker, Michael)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) & (B), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/14/2021. (ln)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Bryan Konoski) by regular mail. (ln)
September 13, 2021 NY State Bar status verified as active for Bryan Konoski not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
September 13, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Johnny A. Walker admitted to this court. (ln)
September 13, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Bryan Konoski: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/4/2021. (ln)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3445986) filed by Kristine Ratanavong. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratanavong v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Ratanavong
Represented By: Bryan Konoski
Represented By: Johnny A. Walker
Represented By: Michael Anthony Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?