Friedmann v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Friedmann
Defendant: Tony Parker, Tony Mays, Michael Keys, George Firestine and Celesta Williams
Case Number: 3:2021cv00721
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Before the Court is the motion of Plaintiff to continue the initial case management conference, filed November 12, 2021, Docket Entry No. #17 . The motion (Docket Entry No. #17 ) is therefore GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from November 15, 2021, to 11:30 a.m., Monday, January 31, 2022, by telephone conference. See Docket Entry No. #7 for dial-in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/12/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to re #12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alexander Friedmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Dec of Other Inmates, #2 Exhibit 2. Letter from Celesta Williams, #3 Exhibit 3. Declaration of Alex Friedmann, #4 Exhibit 3-1 Ltr from Celesta Williams, #5 Exhibit 3-2 Safekeeper form using "iron man" phrase, #6 Exhibit 3-3 Form re cold temperatures, #7 Exhibit 3-4 Form re "good behavior", #8 Exhibit 3-5 Form re: "situational depression", #9 Exhibit 3-6 Form re: mental health cell visits, #10 Exhibit 3-7 Grievance re food menu items, #11 Exhibit 3-8 Commissary Menus, #12 Exhibit 3-9 Grievance re vitamins, #13 Exhibit 3-10 Williams resp. on classification, #14 Exhibit 3-11 Custody Assessment Form, #15 Exhibit 3-12 Williams "safekeepers are not classified", #16 Exhibit 3-13 Print-out from DCSO Website)(Smith, Christopher)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION re #7 Notice of Case Management Conference (Rescheduling) by Alexander Friedmann. (Smith, Christopher)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 1/31/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by George Firestine, Michael Keys, Tony Mays, Tony Parker.(Lorch, Pamela)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by George Firestine, Michael Keys, Tony Mays, Tony Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Blackburn's Order, #2 Exhibit Federal Complaint and Affidavit, #3 Attachment Warden May's Declaration, #4 Attachment Monthly segregation reviews, #5 Attachment Affidavit of KeShawn Abston, #6 Attachment Affidavit of Jacob Herren)(Lorch, Pamela)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr: Status Conference held on 10/15/2021. Defendant's Motion (Doc. No. 11) is Denied. Response to preliminary injunctions shall be filed by 11/2/2021. Reply by 11/12/2021. (Court Reporter Lise Matthews.)(Hearing lasted :10)(Parise, Kelly)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's preliminary injunction motion #12 no later than November 2, 2021. Plaintiff shall file a reply no later than November 12, 2021. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #11 is DENIED. Defendants shall file their answer to the Complaint no later than November 2, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/15/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This case is set for a telephonic status conference for October 15, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. The parties shall call 1-888-278-0296, and when prompted enter access code 6564835# to participate in the call. If a party has difficulty connecting, please contact chambers at 615-736-7013. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/13/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alexander Friedmann. (Smith, Christopher)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by George Firestine, Michael Keys, Tony Mays, Tony Parker. (Lorch, Pamela)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons issued as to Tony Parker. (Service packet is at the intake window for counsel to pick up.) (kc)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Tony Parker. (Smith, Christopher)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/21/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 11/15/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. I recuse myself from this matter. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to assign this case to another magistrate judge by random selection. The initial case management conference set on December 1, 2021, is CANCELLED, to be reset by the magistrate judge to whom the case is transferred. (Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes by the Clerk's Office for all further proceedings.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/17/2021. (kc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons issued as to George Firestine, Michael Keys, Tony Mays, Tony Parker, and Celesta Williams. (Service packet is at the intake window for counsel to pick up.) (kc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 12/1/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher W. Smith, David Randolph Smith, Dominick R. Smith, and William Lyon Chadwick, Jr admitted to this court. (kc)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Firestine, Michael Keys, Tony Mays, Tony Parker, and Celesta Williams (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503449184), filed by Alexander Friedmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TDOC 401.11, #2 Exhibit TDOC 401.05, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2021: #4 Attachment #3 - TDOC Classification User Guide) (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friedmann v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Friedmann
Represented By: Christopher W. Smith
Represented By: David Randolph Smith
Represented By: Dominick R. Smith
Represented By: William Lyon Chadwick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Represented By: Pamela S. Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Mays
Represented By: Pamela S. Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Keys
Represented By: Pamela S. Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Firestine
Represented By: Pamela S. Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celesta Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?