Booth v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Scott Booth
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 3:2021cv00765
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for John Day Peake, III admitted to this court. (bs)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John Day Peake, III on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The (Peake, John)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Iwana Rademaekers to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/09/2021. (lh)
November 9, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Iwana Rademaekers: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 11/30/2021. (bs)
November 9, 2021 TX State Bar status verified as active for Iwana Rademaekers not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (bs)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The.(Rademaekers, Iwana)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Iwana Rademaekers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3480854) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Iwana Rademaekers, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE re service of complaint #1 on Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (vh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. Service copies will be returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
October 6, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for K. Cody Allison, Samuel D. Payne, and Lauren W. Travis admitted to this court. (ln)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3461139) filed by Scott Booth. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booth v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Booth
Represented By: K. Cody Allison
Represented By: Lauren W. Travis
Represented By: Samuel D. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Represented By: John Day Peake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?