Volz v. United States of America
Petitioner: Arthur Jerry Volz
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00773
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Government's Motion to Substitute Counsel (Doc. No. #7 ) is GRANTED and Joe Montminy is substituted for Brent Hannafan as counsel of record for Respondent. Attorney Brent Adams Hannafan terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/1/2021. (ln)
December 1, 2021 FL State Bar status verified as active for Joseph P. Montminy admitted to this court. (ln)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by United States of America. (Montminy, Joseph)
November 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Arthur Jerry Volz Regarding Amended Motion (Holley, Michael)
October 13, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brent Adams Hannafan and Henry Alan Martin admitted to this court. (ln)
October 13, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael C. Holley admitted to this court. (ln)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Holley on behalf of Arthur Jerry Volz (Holley, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court APPOINTS the Federal Public Defender to represent Petitioner. On or before 11/26/2021, appointed counsel shall file an amended petition on behalf of Petitioner. If appointed counsel files an amended petition, that petition will become operative before the Court. On or before 1/14/2022, Respondent may then file a response in accordance with Rule 5 of the 2255 Rules. On or before 1/28/2021, Petitioner may file an optional reply in accordance with Rule 5(d) of the 2255 Rules. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/8/2021. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Arthur Jerry Volz.(ln)
October 7, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volz v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur Jerry Volz
Represented By: Henry Alan Martin
Represented By: Michael C. Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Represented By: Joseph P. Montminy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?