Huether v. Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Huether
Defendant: Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., Continental Motors, Inc., Continental Motors Group Limited, Continental Motors Services, Inc. and Direct Flight Solutions, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Tracy A. Bumpus and Brandon Wright
Case Number: 3:2021cv00783
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
2 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 and #66 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Joseph P. Musacchio and Douglas P. Desjardins to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill on 12/6/2021. (lh)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order DC State Bar status verified as active for Douglas P. Desjardins not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for attorney Douglas P. Desjardins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3491720) by Brian Huether. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Greer, Thomas)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MA State Bar status verified as active for Joseph P. Musacchio not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for attorney Joseph P. Musacchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3490980) by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing)(Tarricone, Anthony)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY filed by Tracy A. Bumpus re #29 Motion for Leave filed by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Tarricone, Anthony)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#63 : The document is not signed. Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 167-1, Section 8, electronically filed documents shall set forth the Filing User's name, address, telephone number and Board of Professional Responsibility registration number. The filer's name should be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear preceded by the symbol "s/" or inserted facsimile signature. Counsel shall re-file the document. (ln)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ****DISREGARD. ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE.**** REPLY in Support re #29 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Tarricone, Anthony) Modified on 11/22/2021 (lh). Modified on 11/23/2021 (ln).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 and #61 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Sherri R. Ginger and Mark B. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill on 11/19/2021. (lh)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order AL State Bar status verified as active for Sherri R. Ginger and Mark B. Roberts not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for attorney Mark B. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3486642) by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for attorney Sherri R. Ginger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3486631) by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE in Support re #28 MOTION to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NTSB Factual Report)(Tarricone, Anthony)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #56 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF COMBINED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND. (Jakes, William)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION To Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, #29 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Skinner, Will)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF COMBINED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. re #33 Plaintiff Brian Huether's Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Aviation Policy, #2 Exhibit National Policy, #3 Exhibit Amicus Brief)(Jakes, William) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (ln).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECLARATION of Ward filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. re: #54 Memorandum in Support. (Jakes, William)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Support of #33 Plaintiff Brian Huether's Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. (Jakes, William)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Permission to File a Reply Brief Exceeding Five Pages (Doc. No. #43 ) and Plaintiff Tracy Bumpus' Motion for Permission to File a Sur-Reply (Doc. No. #51 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/15/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROPOSED SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO CONTINENTAL AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RULE 12(b)(2) MOTION TO DISMISS re #51 Motion for Leave filed by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Tarricone, Anthony) Modified text on 11/12/2021 (ln).
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to to File a Sur-Reply Brief in Support of His Opposition to Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Tarricone, Anthony)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPLY in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. (Jakes, William)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE by Direct Flight Solutions, LLC (Ferrell, E.)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #31 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Arthur J. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/9/2021. (lh)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #27 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Edward C. Bresee to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/8/2021. (lh)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. (Jakes, William)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE by Direct Flight Solutions, LLC re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Reply in Excess of Five Pages (Ferrell, E.)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE by Tracy A. Bumpus (Tarricone, Anthony)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Reply in Excess of Five Pages by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CERTIFICATE Conformed Certificate of Service filed by Brian Huether re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff Brian Huether's Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Brian Huether. (Greer, Thomas)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CERTIFICATE Conformed Certificate of Service filed by Brian Huether re #32 Response to Motion filed by Brian Huether. (Greer, Thomas)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CERTIFICATE Conformed Certificate of Service filed by Brian Huether re #34 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Brian Huether. (Greer, Thomas)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE Conformed Certificate of Service filed by Brian Huether re #38 Notice (Other) filed by Brian Huether. (Greer, Thomas)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE by Brian Huether Notice of Withdrawal of Josh Cannon (Greer, Thomas)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#32 , #33 , #34 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include ALL Counsel on the certificates of service. Please FILE a CONFORMED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for these documents. (ln)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#38 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not sign the certificate of service. Counsel also did not include ALL Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a CONFORMED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for this document. (ln)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION To Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery by Brandon Wright. (Barnett, Kathryn)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Brandon Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Continental Website, #2 Exhibit Competing Quote, #3 Exhibit Emails and Promotional Materials)(Barnett, Kathryn)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 First MOTION to Remand by Brandon Wright. (Barnett, Kathryn)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff Brian Huether's Opposition to Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. Motion to Dismiss filed by Brian Huether. (Greer, Thomas)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Plaintiff Brian Huether's Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Brian Huether. (Greer, Thomas)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Assent to the Dismissal of Continental Motors Group Limited filed by Brian Huether. (Greer, Thomas)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for attorney Arthur J. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3476979) by Direct Flight Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Ferrell, E.)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Anthony Tarricone, #2 Exhibit B- Competing Quotes, #3 Exhibit C-E-mail Communications, #4 Exhibit D- NiC3 Cylinder Coating Promotional Literature, #5 Exhibit E- Continental Services Website)(Tarricone, Anthony)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Tarricone, Anthony)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-FAA Form 8130, #2 Exhibit 2-SIL007 Service Information Letter, #3 Exhibit 3- FAA Order 8100.42d, #4 Exhibit 4- PMA Letter, #5 Exhibit 5- FAA Order 8110.37F, #6 Exhibit 6-FAA Order 8100.15B, #7 Exhibit 7- FAA ODA Directory, #8 Exhibit 8- AC_21.303-4, #9 Exhibit 9- Current PMA, #10 Exhibit 10-FAA Consultant DER Directory, #11 Exhibit 11-Federal Register)(Tarricone, Anthony)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for attorney Edward C. Bresee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3476657) by Direct Flight Solutions, LLC. (Ferrell, E.)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 , #23 , and #24 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Will A. Skinner, Gary A. Gardner, and Erik D. Slechta to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted.Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/27/2021. (lh)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order State Bar status verified as active for Erik D. Slechta (CA), Will Skinner (CA), Gary A. Gardner (NY) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: An Initial Case Management Conference is scheduled January 5, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/25/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Erik D. Slechta to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3472641) by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for attorney Gary A. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3472636) by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Will S. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3472631) by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The above-captioned cases all stem from the same airplane accident and all assert negligence claims against Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., and related defendants. Because these cases involve "common question[s] of law or fact," the Court finds consolidation is appropriate. Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). Accordingly, Case Nos. 3:21-cv-00783, 3:21-cv-00784, and 3:21-cv-00785 are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, including trial. CASE NO. 3:21-cv-00783 WILL SERVE AS THE LEAD CASE. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE ONLY. The Clerk is directed to file this Order in Case Nos. 3:21-cv-00783, 3:21-cv-00784, and 3:21-cv-00785. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/22/2021. (ln)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order GA State Bar status verified as active for Edward C. Bresee, Jr. and Arthur J. Park not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Edward C. Bresee, Jr. and Arthur J. Park: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/12/2021. (ln)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern no longer assigned to the case. The initial case management conference set on January 6, 2022 is CANCELLED and will be reset. See DE 19 in related case 3:21-cv-0785. (vh)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: On October 19, 2021, Defendants Continental Motors Group Limited and Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., filed a motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2). (Doc. No. #11 , #14 .) Under Local Rule 7.01(a)(3), any response in opposition must be filed within fourteen days of service of the motion. An optional reply may be filed within seven days of service of a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/20/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Direct Flight Solutions, LLC. (Ferrell, E.)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Direct Flight Solutions, LLC.(Ferrell, E.)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, FAA Aircraft Registry Record)(Jakes, William)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Michael Ward filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Continental's File for W/O #ES-8663, #2 Exhibit 2, Continental's Terms & Conditions, #3 Exhibit 3, Continental's File for W/O #ES-9036, #4 Exhibit 4, Email Communications)(Jakes, William)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. . (Jakes, William)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Stephen R. Ginger filed by Continental Motors Group Limited re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Jakes, William)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Continental Motors Group Limited . (Jakes, William)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Continental Motors Group Limited. (Jakes, William)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. re #7 Notice (Other), Documents Filed in Joinder of Removal (Jakes, William)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for E. Jason Ferrell admitted to this court. (ln)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Jason Ferrell on behalf of Direct Flight Solutions, LLC (Ferrell, E.)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of ALL attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a NOTICE that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (ln)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/14/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, of Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice, #2 Attachment Declaration of Ward, #3 Attachment Declaration of Jakes, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Jakes Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Jakes Declaration, #6 Attachment Business Entity Disclosure)(Jakes, William)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. (ln)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., Continental Motors Group Limited from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 21C1508. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0650-3465316). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Attachment 1 - Jakes Declaration, #3 Attachment 2 - Ginger Declaration, #4 Attachment 3 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas R. Greer admitted to this court. (ln)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Josh Cannon: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 11/3/2021. (ln)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Will Skinner, Gary A. Gardner, Douglas P. Desjardins: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/3/2021. (ln)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for William Bryan Jakes, III admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huether v. Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Huether
Represented By: Douglas P. Desjardins
Represented By: Josh Cannon
Represented By: Thomas R. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Gary A. Gardner
Represented By: Will Skinner
Represented By: William Bryan Jakes, III
Represented By: Erik D. Slechta
Represented By: Mark B. Roberts
Represented By: Sherri R. Ginger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Erik D. Slechta
Represented By: Gary A. Gardner
Represented By: Mark B. Roberts
Represented By: Sherri R. Ginger
Represented By: Will Skinner
Represented By: William Bryan Jakes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors Group Limited
Represented By: Gary A. Gardner
Represented By: Will Skinner
Represented By: William Bryan Jakes, III
Represented By: Erik D. Slechta
Represented By: Mark B. Roberts
Represented By: Sherri R. Ginger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors Services, Inc.
Represented By: Erik D. Slechta
Represented By: Gary A. Gardner
Represented By: Mark B. Roberts
Represented By: Sherri R. Ginger
Represented By: Will Skinner
Represented By: William Bryan Jakes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Flight Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Arthur J. Park
Represented By: E. Jason Ferrell
Represented By: Edward C. Bresee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tracy A. Bumpus
Represented By: Anthony Tarricone
Represented By: Brandon E. Bass
Represented By: John A. Day
Represented By: Joseph P. Musacchio
Represented By: Kevin J Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brandon Wright
Represented By: Kathryn E. Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?