Bumpus v. Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tracy A. Bumpus
Defendant: Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., Continental Motors, Inc., Continental Motors Services, Inc. and Direct Flight Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00784
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Kevin J. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/1/2021. (lh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT re #20 MOTION for attorney Kevin J. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3473354) by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Tarricone, Anthony)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Anthony Tarricone to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/27/2021. (lh)
October 26, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney Kevin J. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3473354) by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Tarricone, Anthony)
October 26, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT re #18 MOTION for attorney Anthony Tarricone to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3472724) by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Tarricone, Anthony)
October 26, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#18 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (dt)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Anthony Tarricone to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3472724) by Tracy A. Bumpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Tarricone, Anthony)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The above-captioned cases all stem from the same airplane accident and all assert negligence claims against Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., and related defendants. Because these cases involve "common question[s] of law or fact," the Court finds consolidation is appropriate. Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). Accordingly, Case Nos. 3:21-cv-00783, 3:21-cv-00784, and 3:21-cv-00785 are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, including trial. CASE NO. 3:21-cv-00783 WILL SERVE AS THE LEAD CASE. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE ONLY. The Clerk is directed to file this Order in Case Nos. 3:21-cv-00783, 3:21-cv-00784, and 3:21-cv-00785. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/22/2021. (ln)
October 21, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern no longer assigned to the case. The initial case management conference set on January 6, 2022 is CANCELLED and will be reset. See DE 19 in related case 3:21-cv-0785. (vh)
October 21, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for E. Jason Ferrell admitted to this court. (dt)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/20/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Direct Flight Solutions, LLC. (Ferrell, E.)
October 20, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Direct Flight Solutions, LLC.(Ferrell, E.)
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, FAA Aircraft Registry Record)(Jakes, William)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Michael Ward filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Continental's File for W/O #ES-8663, #2 Exhibit 2, Continental's Terms & Conditions, #3 Exhibit 3, Continental's File for W/O #ES-9036, #4 Exhibit 4, Email Communications)(Jakes, William)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. . (Jakes, William)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Chief Judge Crenshaw, as it is related to an earlier-filed case assigned to him, Case Number 3:21-cv-783. The initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on January 10, 2022 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/19/2021. (mg)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2022 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
October 18, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for E. Jason Ferrell admitted to this court. (dt)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Jason Ferrell on behalf of Direct Flight Solutions, LLC (Ferrell, E.)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (dt)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.. (dt)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of William B. Jakes, III filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint from State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing)(dt)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Michael Ward filed by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. re: #1 Notice of Removal. (dt)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. from Circuit Court of Davidson County, Tennessee at Nashville, case number 21C1509. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650-3465328) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint from State Court, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)
October 13, 2021 MA State Bar status verified as active for Anthony Tarricone not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt)
October 13, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Anthony Tarricone, Kevin J Mahoney, Will Skinner and Gary A. Gardner: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/3/2021. (dt)
October 13, 2021 NY State Bar status verified as active for Kevin J Mahoney, Gary A. Gardner not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt)
October 13, 2021 CA State Bar status verified as active for Will Skinner not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt)
October 13, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for John A. Day, Brandon E. Bass and William Bryan Jakes, III admitted to this court. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bumpus v. Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy A. Bumpus
Represented By: Anthony Tarricone
Represented By: Brandon E. Bass
Represented By: John A. Day
Represented By: Kevin J Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Gary A. Gardner
Represented By: Will Skinner
Represented By: William Bryan Jakes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Flight Solutions, LLC
Represented By: E. Jason Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?