Rowe v. Silicon Private Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Rowe
Defendant: Silicon Private Capital, LLC and Rapid Merchant Capital, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00841
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mary Ellen Rowe. Silicon Private Capital, LLC waiver sent on 12/1/2021. (Tarpley, David)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/10/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/18/2022 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (vh)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (vh)
November 9, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for David J. Tarpley, Bret J. Chaness, and Patricia Lynn Whitehead admitted to this court. (vh)
November 9, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL J. Kevin Fowler: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 11/30/2021. (vh)
November 9, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Kevin Fowler not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (vh)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Silicon Private Capital, LLC from Chancery Court of Humphreys County, case number 2021-CV-182. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650-3480609) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Silicon Private Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Rowe
Represented By: David J. Tarpley
Represented By: J. Kevin Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Private Capital, LLC
Represented By: Bret J. Chaness
Represented By: Patricia Lynn Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid Merchant Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?