Battle et al v. State of Tennessee, et al
Plaintiff: Dontay Battle, Necoas Wilson, David Underwood, Christal Helton, Patrick Downs and Disability Rights Tennessee
Defendant: State of Tennessee, Tennessee Department of Developmental and Intellectual Disabilities and Tennessee Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services
Case Number: 3:2022cv00022
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12131 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State of Tennessee, Tennessee Department of Developmental and Intellectual Disabilities, Tennessee Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services.(Cadle, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B. Cadle on behalf of All Defendants (Cadle, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stacie L. Price (Price, Stacie)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: #9 Motion GRANTED. Extension to 3-14-2022. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/4/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
February 3, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by State of Tennessee, Tennessee Department of Developmental and Intellectual Disabilities, Tennessee Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services. (Hart, Steven) Modified on 2/4/2022 (kc).
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Dontay Battle. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USPS Return Receipt)(Price, Stacie)
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Patrick Downs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USPS Return Receipt)(Price, Stacie)
February 3, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Dontay Battle. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USPS Return Receipt)(Price, Stacie)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to State of Tennessee, Tennessee Department of Developmental and Intellectual Disabilities, and Tennessee Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc) Modified on 1/18/2022 (kc).
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 3/24/2022 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
January 18, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Stacie L. Price, Daniel L. Ellis, Jack Derryberry, Nathan W. Walsh, and Christopher J. Barrett admitted to this court. (kc)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Tennessee, Tennessee Department of Developmental and Intellectual Disabilities, and Tennessee Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503514044), filed by David Underwood, Disability Rights Tennessee, Dontay Battle, Necoas Wilson, Christal Helton, and Patrick Downs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle et al v. State of Tennessee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontay Battle
Represented By: Christopher J. Barrett
Represented By: Daniel L. Ellis
Represented By: Jack Derryberry
Represented By: Nathan W. Walsh
Represented By: Stacie L. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Necoas Wilson
Represented By: Christopher J. Barrett
Represented By: Daniel L. Ellis
Represented By: Jack Derryberry
Represented By: Nathan W. Walsh
Represented By: Stacie L. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Underwood
Represented By: Christopher J. Barrett
Represented By: Daniel L. Ellis
Represented By: Jack Derryberry
Represented By: Nathan W. Walsh
Represented By: Stacie L. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christal Helton
Represented By: Christopher J. Barrett
Represented By: Daniel L. Ellis
Represented By: Jack Derryberry
Represented By: Nathan W. Walsh
Represented By: Stacie L. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Downs
Represented By: Christopher J. Barrett
Represented By: Daniel L. Ellis
Represented By: Jack Derryberry
Represented By: Nathan W. Walsh
Represented By: Stacie L. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disability Rights Tennessee
Represented By: Jack Derryberry
Represented By: Nathan W. Walsh
Represented By: Stacie L. Price
Represented By: Christopher J. Barrett
Represented By: Daniel L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cadle
Represented By: Steven Ashley Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Developmental and Intellectual Disabilities
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cadle
Represented By: Steven Ashley Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cadle
Represented By: Steven Ashley Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?