Emerson v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tammy Emerson
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00095
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-All Other Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Tammy Emerson. (Freeman, Mark)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(h)(2), the District Judge is provided notice that on March 14, 2022, Defendant filed a motion and memorandum to compel arbitration and stay all proceedings (Docket Nos. #9 , #10 ). Responsive briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.01. The Clerk is directed to forward the motion to the Judge Richardson for his consideration. Subject to further order, the initial case management conference scheduled for April 7, 2022 is RESCHEDULED for August 17, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. to be held telephonically using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. The parties are reminded of their obligation to prepare and file a joint proposed initial case management order in advance of the initial case management conference and to separately email a copy to the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/15/2022. (bs) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) Modified on 3/15/2022 adding TEXT SUMMARY ONLY...(bs).
March 14, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. . (Longnecker, Joy)
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Contract)(Longnecker, Joy)
February 21, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Tammy Emerson. All Defendants. (Freeman, Mark)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
February 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/7/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (bs)
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Service copies return to counsel by USPS.) (bs)
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (bs)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (bs)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (bs)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3532128), filed by Tammy Emerson. (Attachment: #1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(bs)
February 14, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark T. Freeman admitted to this court. (bs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Emerson
Represented By: Mark T. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Joy Boyd Longnecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?