Bereda et al v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Bereda, Angelene Hoeffken and Scott Neri
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00098
Filed: February 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
2 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
3 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Case consolidated with 3:19-cv-0843 and 3:19-cv-0854 for pretrial purposes only per Order at DE 233 in case 3:19-cv-0843. (ln)
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Bereda, Scott Neri, Angelene Hoeffken. Nissan North America, Inc. waiver sent on 2/18/2022. (Gastel, Benjamin)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This matter is related to In re Nissan North America, Inc. Litigation, Case No. 3:19-cv-00843, and Kemp v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al., Case No. 3:19-cv-00854, which are pending before Magistrate Judge Frensley. Accordingly, the Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to Magistrate Judge Frensley for all future proceedings. The initial case management conference set on April 27, 2022, is CANCELLED and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/17/2022. (bs)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this action is transferred to U.S. District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr. as a "Related Case" to Civil Action Nos. 3:19-cv-00843 and 3:19-cv-00854. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/16/2022. (jm)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc. (Service copies to be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/27/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
February 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (jm)
February 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3532666), filed by Michelle Bereda, Scott Neri, and Angelene Hoeffken. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jm)
February 15, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Gerard Stranch, IV and Benjamin A. Gastel; OH State Bar status verified as active for Alyson Steele Beridon admitted to this court. (jm) Modified on 2/15/2022 (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bereda et al v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Bereda
Represented By: Alyson S. Beridon
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelene Hoeffken
Represented By: Alyson S. Beridon
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Neri
Represented By: Alyson S. Beridon
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?