State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America doing business as United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2022cv00170
Filed: March 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's motion to continue the Initial Case Management Conference, filed April 8, 2022, Docket Entry No. #10 . The motion states that it is unopposed by Plaintiff, so for the reasons requested, the motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from May 2, 2022, to 10:30 a.m., Wednesday, June 15, 2022, by telephone conference. See Docket Entry No. #6 for dial-in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/11/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
April 11, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael L. Roden admitted to this court. (kc)
April 11, 2022 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 6/15/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln)
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Continue INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by United States of America. (Roden, Michael)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Roden on behalf of United States of America (Roden, Michael)
April 5, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Merrick B. Garland, Mark H. Wildasin, Louis DeJoy on Garland - 03/21/1022; Wildasin - 03/15/2022; DeJoy - 04/01/2022 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. All Defendants. (Aymett, John)
March 11, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
March 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 5/2/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
March 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
March 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Aymett, John)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to United States of America doing business as United States Postal Service. (Aymett, John)
March 11, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for John Stephen Aymett, Jr admitted to this court. (kc)
March 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503547908), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Final Denial Letter, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John Stephen Aymett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America doing business as United States Postal Service
Represented By: Michael L. Roden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?