NEO Wireless, LLC v. Nissan North America Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NEO Wireless, LLC
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptnce Corporation, Nissan North America Inc., Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC and Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00220
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AGREED ORDER: Nissan Motor Acceptnce Corporation answer due 6/20/2022; Nissan North America Inc. answer due 6/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 6/30/2022 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/21/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Motion #15 for Entry of Agreed Order GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/21/2022. (ln)
April 21, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order by Nissan Motor Acceptnce Corporation, Nissan North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time)(Hicks, John)
April 12, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by NEO Wireless, LLC Regarding MDL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL Filing)(Lenihan, Mark)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Jason D. Cassady to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 04/12/2022. (lh)
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Jason D. Cassady to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3573122) by NEO Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Lenihan, Mark)
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by NEO Wireless, LLC. (Lenihan, Mark)
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by NEO Wireless, LLC. (Lenihan, Mark)
April 5, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DEs#8 and #9 : The incorrect PDF was filed. This document is disregarded. Counsel shall re-file the document. The "Return" Summons was not attached. (kc)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD. INCORRECT DOCUMENT.***SUMMONS returned executed by NEO Wireless, LLC. Nissan Motor Acceptnce Corporation served on 3/31/2022. (Lenihan, Mark) Modified on 4/5/2022 (kc).
April 4, 2022 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD. INCORRECT DOCUMENT.***SUMMONS returned executed by NEO Wireless, LLC. Nissan North America Inc. served on 3/31/2022. (Lenihan, Mark) Modified on 4/5/2022 (kc).
March 30, 2022 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEO Wireless, LLC. (Lenihan, Mark)
March 30, 2022 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Nissan Motor Acceptnce Corporation and Nissan North America Inc. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
March 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 6/2/2022 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
March 29, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan Motor Acceptnce Corporation and Nissan North America Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3564400), filed by NEO Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Patent No. 8,467,366, #3 Exhibit 2 Patent No. 10,833,908, #4 Exhibit 3 Patent No. 10,075,941, #5 Exhibit 4 Patent No. 10,447,450, #6 Exhibit 5 Patent No. 10,447,450, #7 Exhibit 6 Patent No. 10,771,302, #8 Exhibit 7 Claim 1 of 8,467,366, #9 Exhibit 8 Claim 11 of 10,833,908, #10 Exhibit 9 Claim of 10,075,941, #11 Exhibit 10 Claim 7 of 10,447,450, #12 Exhibit 11 Claim 15 of 10,965,512, #13 Exhibit 12 Claim of 10,771,302)(kc)
March 29, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jason D. Cassady: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/19/2022. (kc)
March 29, 2022 TX State Bar status verified as active for Jason D. Cassady not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
March 29, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Samuel P. Funk and Mark W. Lenihan admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEO Wireless, LLC v. Nissan North America Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptnce Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc.
Represented By: John S. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC
Represented By: John S. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: John S. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEO Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Jason D. Cassady
Represented By: Mark W. Lenihan
Represented By: Samuel P. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?