Santos v. Lane et al
Plaintiff: Fesnando F. Santos
Defendant: Lieutenant f/n/u Lane and Sergeant f/n/u Coon
Case Number: 3:2022cv00231
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons issued as to f/n/u Coon and f/n/u Lane. (Service packet forwarded to USM box at intake.) (kc)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Assessing Filing Fee: Plaintiff FESNANDO F. SANTOS' application to proceed as a pauper #2 is GRANTED, and he is ASSESSED the $350.00 filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Davidson County Sheriff's Office to ensure that the custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account complies with the portion of 28 U.S.C. 1915 pertaining to payment of the filing fee. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff two service packets (a blank summons and USM 285 form). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/9/2022. (xc: Order and 2 service packs forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail. Order forwarded to DCSO by regular mail.) (kc)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/9/2022. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Fesnando F. Santos. (kc)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against f/n/u Coon and f/n/u Lane, filed by Fesnando F. Santos. (IFP pending.) (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fesnando F. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant f/n/u Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant f/n/u Coon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?