Ketler et al v. Highland Rim Aviation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Noah Ketler and Ashley Ketler
Defendant: Highland Rim Aviation, LLC and Darkhorse Maintenance, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00235
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Airline Crash
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties have notified the Court that they have reached a resolution of all claims in this matter (Doc. No. #13 ). Accordingly, the initial case management conference set on May 31, 2022, is CANCELLED. The parties are ORDERED to make the necessary filings to terminate the resolved claims by June 2, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/2/2022. (vh)
April 29, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Ashley Ketler, Noah Ketler (Hadley, Edward)
April 22, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Noah Ketler, Ashley Ketler. Darkhorse Maintenance, LLC served on 4/14/2022. (Hadley, Edward)
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Noah Ketler, Ashley Ketler. Highland Rim Aviation, LLC served on 4/14/2022. (Hadley, Edward)
April 20, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Ketler, Noah Ketler re #1 Complaint VIA HAND DELIVERY TO DARKHORSE MAIINTENANCE, LLC (Hadley, Edward)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Ketler, Noah Ketler VIA HAND DELIVERY TO HIGHLAND RIM AVIATION (Hadley, Edward)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/5/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 5/31/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (bs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Highland Rim Aviation, LLC. (Service copy to be picked up by party at Clerk's Office window.) (bs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Darkhorse Maintenance, LLC. (Service copy to be picked up by party at Clerk's Office window.) (bs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (bs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (bs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (bs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darkhorse Maintenance, LLC, Highland Rim Aviation, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number BTNMDC-3568693), filed by Noah Ketler, Ashley Ketler. (Attachments: #1Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3Summons)(bs)
April 4, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Edward A. Hadley admitted to this court. (bs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ketler et al v. Highland Rim Aviation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Ketler
Represented By: Edward A. Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Ketler
Represented By: Edward A. Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Rim Aviation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darkhorse Maintenance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?