Moss v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mary Moss
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2022cv00293
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney General on 05/05/2022. (ln)
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed. Social Security Administration served on 5/2/2022. (ln)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Melanie Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 05/10/2022. (lh)
May 9, 2022 GA State Bar status verified as active for Melanie N. Williams not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
May 6, 2022 Filing 9 First MOTION for attorney Melanie Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3589283) by Mary Moss. (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of good standing, #2 Attachment good standing)(Coleman, Erin)
April 29, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney's Office on 04/29/2022. (ln)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies forwarded to the U.S. Marshals to effect service. (ln)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff Mary Moss has filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis in this action. (Doc. No. #2 .) The Court has reviewed Moss's application and GRANTS her motion. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to issue a summons to the Social Security Administration and forward the summons to the U.S. Marshals Service to effect service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/28/2022.(ln)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all non-dispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ) is also referred to the Magistrate Judge for decision. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/27/2022. (ln)
April 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
April 26, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Erin D. Coleman admitted to this court. (ln)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mary Moss. (ln)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (filing fee not paid) filed by Mary Moss. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Moss
Represented By: Erin D. Coleman
Represented By: Melanie N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?