Martinez et al v. Nissan North America Inc.
Plaintiff: Minerva Martinez, Sandra Scott, Carl Graham, Anne Parys, David Ortiz, Sean Chambers and Tiffany James
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00354
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #79 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Payam Shahian to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 03/21/2023. (lh)
March 20, 2023 Filing 85 Consent MOTION Entering the proposed Order and Judgment by Nissan North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order and Judgment Granting Final Approval)(Cauley, E.)
March 20, 2023 Filing 84 NOTICE by Guadalupe Martines Solano, Filomeno Estanislao Vargas re #80 Objections,,,,, Notice of Withdrawal of Objections by Guadalupe Solan and Filomeno Vargas (Bowen, Jay)
March 20, 2023 Filing 83 RESPONSE filed by Nissan North America Inc. re #80 Objections,,,,, filed by Sandra Scott, Sean Chambers, Anne Parys, Carl Graham, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Tiffany James . (Cauley, E.)
March 20, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Eli J. Richardson: Fairness Hearing held on 3/20/2023. (Court Reporter Debbie Watson.) (Hearing lasted 1:18)(Jackson, Julie)
March 17, 2023 Filing 82 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Objections to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Request for Supplemental Class Notice with Spanish Translation and Notice to Class Members with Pending Litigation Against Defendant Nissan North America re #80 Objections,,,,, by Guadalupe Martines Solano, Filomeno Estanislao Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Long Form Spanish Language of Notice of Proposed Agreement, #2 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #3 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #4 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #5 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #6 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #7 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #8 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #9 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #10 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #11 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #12 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #13 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #14 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #15 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #16 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #17 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #18 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #19 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #20 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #21 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #22 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #23 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #24 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #25 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #26 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #27 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #28 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #29 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #30 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #31 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #32 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #33 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #34 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #35 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #36 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #37 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #38 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #39 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #40 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #41 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #42 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #43 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #44 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #45 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #46 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #47 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #48 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #49 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #50 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #51 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #52 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #53 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #54 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #55 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #56 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #57 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #58 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #59 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #60 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #61 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #62 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #63 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #64 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #65 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #66 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #67 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #68 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #69 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #70 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #71 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #72 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #73 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #74 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #75 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #76 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #77 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #78 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #79 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #80 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #81 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #82 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #83 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #84 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #85 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #86 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #87 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #88 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #89 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #90 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #91 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #92 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #93 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #94 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #95 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #96 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #97 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #98 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #99 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #100 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #101 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #102 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #103 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #104 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #105 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #106 Exhibit Request to be excluded, #107 Exhibit Request to be excluded)(Bowen, Jay)
March 17, 2023 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Lana Cooper - Third Supplemental Declaration Re: Exclusion Requests filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Edwards, Adam)
March 17, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jay Scott Bowen admitted to this court. (ad)
March 17, 2023 CA State Bar status verified as active for Payam Shahian not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
March 17, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jacob T. Clabo admitted to this court. (ad)
March 16, 2023 Filing 80 OBJECTIONS to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Ex Parte Request for Supplemental Class Notice with Spanish Translation and Notice to Class Members with Pending Litigation Against Defendant Nissan North America filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re #48 Motion for Settlement,. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Filomeno Vargas Declaration, #2 Attachment Guadalupe Solano Declaration, #3 Attachment Payam Shahian Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 16 to Payam Shahian Declaration, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 17 to Payam Shahian Declaration)(Bowen, Jay)
March 16, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION for attorney Payam Shahian to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3784420) by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Bowen, Jay)
March 16, 2023 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob T. Clabo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Clabo, Jacob)
March 16, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Scott Bowen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bowen, Jay)
March 9, 2023 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Support re #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. filed by Nissan North America Inc.. (Hicks, John)
March 6, 2023 Filing 75 DECLARATION of John S. Hicks filed by Nissan North America Inc. re: #74 Response (Non-Motion or 2255 Petition),. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cappello Objection, #2 Exhibit B - Vinson Objection)(Hicks, John)
March 6, 2023 Filing 74 RESPONSE filed by Nissan North America Inc. re #48 Motion for Settlement, filed by Sandra Scott, Sean Chambers, Anne Parys, Carl Graham, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Tiffany James to Objections to Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement. (Hicks, John)
March 6, 2023 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Melissa S. Weiner in Support of Plaintiffs' Response in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #72 Response in Support of Motion,, #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - Cappello Objection, #2 Exhibit EX B - Vinson Objection, #3 Exhibit EX C - Cappello Decl, #4 Exhibit EX D - Bennett Decl)(Coleman, Gregory)
March 6, 2023 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Support re #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards Plaintiffs' Response in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Coleman, Gregory)
March 6, 2023 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Lana Cooper (Second Supplemental Declaration Re: Exclusion Requests) filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Coleman, Gregory)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Bradley J. Andreozzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 03/02/2023. (lh)
March 2, 2023 IL State Bar status verified as active for Bradley J. Andreozzi not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
March 2, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for John S. Hicks admitted to this court. (ad)
March 1, 2023 Filing 69 MOTION for attorney Bradley J. Andreozzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3773104) by Nissan North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Hicks, John)
February 22, 2023 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Lana Cooper Re: Exclusion Requests filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Opt Out Report)(Coleman, Gregory)
February 16, 2023 Filing 67 Letter from Duane Cox. (ad)
February 16, 2023 Filing 66 Letter from Da'Lisa Bennett. (ad)
February 10, 2023 Filing 65 Letter from Patricia Robbins. (ad)
February 9, 2023 Filing 64 Letter from Mark Nieto. (ad)
January 30, 2023 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Lana Cooper - Supplemental Declaration Re: Notice Procedures filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #53 Declaration,,,. (Coleman, Gregory)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #47 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Michael H. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 01/23/2023. (lh)
January 18, 2023 Filing 61 RECEIPT #34675068217 in the amount of $150.00 re #47 Michael H. Pearson's Motion for Pro HOC Vice (ad)
January 12, 2023 Filing 60 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards. (Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Gregory F. Coleman filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards, #51 Memorandum in Support, #49 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC Firm Resume)(Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Tarek H. Zohdy filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards, #51 Memorandum in Support, #49 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Capstone Law APC Firm Resume)(Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Lawrence Deutsch filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards, #51 Memorandum in Support, #49 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Berger Montague Firm Resume)(Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Norberto J. Cisneros filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards, #51 Memorandum in Support, #49 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Maddox & Cisneros Firm Resume)(Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Natalie Finkelman Bennett filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards, #51 Memorandum in Support, #49 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Miller Shaw Firm Resume)(Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Melissa S. Weiner filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards, #51 Memorandum in Support, #49 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Pearson Warshaw Firm Resume)(Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Lana Cooper Re: Notice Procedures filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #49 Memorandum in Support, #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - CAFA Notice Packet, #2 Exhibit Ex. B -the U.S. Attorney General, the Attorneys General of individual states and the District of Columbia, and the five recognized U.S. Territories, as well as parties of interest to this Action, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Supplemental CAFA Notice Letter, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Summary Notice, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Fleet Notice)(Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Lee M. Bowron filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards, #51 Memorandum in Support, #49 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Report Supporting Declaration of Lee M. Bowron)(Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support of #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott . (Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support of #48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott . (Coleman, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Coleman, Gregory)
January 9, 2023 CA State Bar status verified as active for Michael H. Pearson not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
January 6, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION for attorney Michael H. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/9/2023) (ad).
January 4, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott Notice of Change of Firm Name and Email Address (Weiner, Melissa)
December 28, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for E. Paul Cauley, Jr admitted to this court. (ad)
December 22, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Paul Cauley, Jr on behalf of Nissan North America Inc. (Cauley, E.)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PROTECTIVE ORDER: AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL DISCOVERY MATERIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/12/22. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/12/22. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
December 9, 2022 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Protective Order Regarding Confidential Discovery Material)(Coleman, Gregory)
September 26, 2022 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minerva Martinez re #39 Notice of Change of Address (Cisneros, Norberto)
September 22, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#39 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (gb)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: The parties have moved to cancel the initial case management conference set on September 26, 2022, in light of the preliminary approval of a class action settlement ( #31 ) and fairness hearing set on March 20, 2023 ( #36 ). The motion is GRANTED and the initial case management conference is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/21/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
September 21, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change of Address by Norberto J. Cisneros (Cisneros, Norberto)
September 20, 2022 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Cancel or Continue Case Management Conference and to Waive Requirement of Submission of Proposed Case Management Order re #37 Order,, Set Hearings, by Nissan North America Inc.. (Hicks, John)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/26/2022 at 02:00 PM. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/9/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Reset Fairness Hearing Date in Preliminary Approval Order of Class Action Settlement #35 is Granted. Fairness Hearing is reset for 3/20/2023 at 1:00 PM. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/6/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified text on 9/7/2022 (hb).
September 1, 2022 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Reset Fairness Hearing Date in Preliminary Approval Order of Class Action Settlement re #31 Order by Nissan North America Inc.. (Hicks, John)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/31/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
August 25, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melissa S. Weiner (Weiner, Melissa)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: As is reflected in more detail in the Preliminary Approval Order of Class Action Settlement, the Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement (Doc. No. #20 ) is GRANTED. However, counsel is hereby advised that all notices issued shall be updated to include (use) the name of the undersigned as the newly-assigned judge on this case, as well as the Court's new address (and the undersigned' s specific courtroom number therein): Fred D. Thompson Federal Building & Courthouse, Courtroom 5C, 719 Church Street, Nashville, TN 37203. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/17/2022. (bs)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/17/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
August 4, 2022 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re #25 Declaration, #22 Declaration, #23 Declaration, #20 MOTION for Settlement -Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant, #28 Additional Attachments to Main Document, #24 Declaration, #26 Declaration, #27 Declaration, #21 Memorandum in Support, (Weiner, Melissa)
August 4, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#'s #20 - #28 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for these documents. (dt)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 176, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Eli Richardson, as it is related to an earlier-filed action assigned to him. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/3/2022. (dt)
August 1, 2022 Filing 28 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #20 MOTION for Settlement -Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant. (Weiner, Melissa)
August 1, 2022 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Carla Peak filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #20 MOTION for Settlement -Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant. (Weiner, Melissa)
August 1, 2022 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Tarek H. Zohdy filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #20 MOTION for Settlement -Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Capstone Law Firm Resume)(Weiner, Melissa)
August 1, 2022 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Natalie Finkelman Bennett filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #20 MOTION for Settlement -Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Miller Shah Firm Resume)(Weiner, Melissa)
August 1, 2022 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Lawrence Deutsch filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #20 MOTION for Settlement -Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Berger Montague PC Firm Resume)(Weiner, Melissa)
August 1, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Norberto J. Cisneros filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #20 MOTION for Settlement -Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- MC Firm Resume)(Weiner, Melissa)
August 1, 2022 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Melissa S. Weiner filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott re: #20 MOTION for Settlement -Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- PSW Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2- Terms of Settlement)(Weiner, Melissa)
August 1, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of #20 MOTION for Settlement -Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott . (Weiner, Melissa)
August 1, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Settlement -Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Defendant by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Weiner, Melissa)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Motion for Continuance of Case Management Conference #18 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 9/26/2022 at 2:00 PM. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 15, 2022 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT (Joint) and Motion for Continuance of Case Management Conference by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Continuance of CMC)(Weiner, Melissa)
June 23, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Nissan North America Inc..(Hicks, John)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , and #15 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Cody R. Padgett, Lawrence Deutsch, Laura E. Goolsby, Tarek H. Zohdy, James C. Shah, Natalie F. Bennett, and Norberto J. Cisneros are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/07/2022. (lh)
June 6, 2022 State Bar status verified as active for Laura Goolsby (CA), Tarek H. Zohdy (CA), Cody R. Padgett (CA), Norberto J. Cisneros (NV), James C. Shah (PA), Natalie Finkelman Bennett (PA), Lawrence Deutsch (PA) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt)
June 3, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Norberto J. Cisneros to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3606316) by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
June 3, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Natalie F. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3605921) by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney James C. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3605911) by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
May 26, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Tarek H. Zohdy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3601801) by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
May 26, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Laura E. Goolsby to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3601792) by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
May 26, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Lawrence Deutsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3601785) by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Cody R. Padgett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3601761) by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carl Graham, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, Sean Chambers. Nissan North America Inc. waiver sent on 5/16/2022. (Coleman, Gregory)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Melissa S. Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 05/24/2022. (lh)
May 22, 2022 MN State Bar status verified as active for Melissa Weiner not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (bs)
May 20, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Melissa S. Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3598589) by Sean Chambers, Carl Graham, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2022 at 1:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Nissan North America Inc. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
May 17, 2022 CA State Bar status verified as active for Tarek H. Zohdy and Cody R. Padgett not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt) Modified on 5/17/2022 (dt).
May 17, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Tarek H. Zohdy, Cody R. Padgett, Norberto J. Cisneros, Barbara McDonald, Melissa Weiner, James C. Shah, Natalie Finkelman Bennett, Lawrence Deutsch, Russell D. Paul, Amey J. Park, Abigail J. Gertner: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/7/2022. (dt)
May 17, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory F. Coleman admitted to this court. (dt)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan North America Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3595242), filed by Carl Graham, David Ortiz, Anne Parys, Sandra Scott, Tiffany James, Minerva Martinez and Sean Chambers. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Nissan North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Martinez
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa Weiner
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Michael H. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Scott
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa Weiner
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Michael H. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Graham
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa Weiner
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Michael H. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Parys
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa Weiner
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Michael H. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ortiz
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa Weiner
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Michael H. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Chambers
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa Weiner
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Michael H. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany James
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa Weiner
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Represented By: Michael H. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc.
Represented By: John S. Hicks
Represented By: E. Paul Cauley, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley J. Andreozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?