Garrett v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Katrina Marie Garrett
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2022cv00356
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney's Office; served on 07/12/2022. (ln)
June 29, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies forwarded to U.S. Marshals to effect service. (ln)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis. Docket No. #2 . The application is approved, and the Clerk is permitted to file the case and send the summonses and complaint to the Defendant, the U.S. Attorney for the Middle District of Tennessee and to the Attorney General of the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 6/28/2022. (ln)
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Katrina Marie Garrett. (Carr, April)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all non-dispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. The Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ) is also referred to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/19/2022. (ln)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Katrina Marie Garrett. (ln)
May 17, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee not paid) filed by Katrina Marie Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #3 Attachment 2 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
May 17, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for April Adams Carr admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Marie Garrett
Represented By: April Adams Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?