Nelson v. Sharp
Plaintiff: Robbin Nelson
Defendant: Heather Sharp
Interested Party: Robert A. Sharp, Jr., Jerry Wells, Minor Child 1 and Minor Child 2
Case Number: 3:2022cv00424
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Plaintiff Robbin Nelson filed an "Amended Independent Collateral Attack Complaint" ("complaint") against defendant Heather Sharp and other "real parties in interest." (Doc. No. #15 .) Here, the plaintiff has not yet satisfied Rule 8. The sixty-page complaint is not a "a short and plain statement" of the plaintiff's claims; rather, it is a rambling recitation riddled with asides and attacks of a long-running, multistate custody battle. (See Doc. No. #15 .) Nor does the lengthy complaint contain "simple, concise, and direct" factual allegations; to the contrary, it includes innumerable, difficult-to-parse details. Id. For these reasons, the complaint does not yet demonstrate a plausible right to relief. Bell Atl. Corp. v. Twombly, 550 U.S. 544, 555 (2007). The court will, however, allow the pro se plaintiff to address this concern. Accordingly, the plaintiff MUST submit a second amended complaint within 30 DAYS of the date this order is entered on the docket. The Clerk SHALL mail the plaintiff a blank complaint for violation of civil rights (Pro Se 15). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/5/2022. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail, w/blank civil rights complaint. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 3, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED INDEPENDENT COLLATERAL ATTACH COMPLAINT against Heather Sharp, filed by Robbin Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - G)(dt)
August 3, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Robbin Nelson with the #13 Order Regarding Amended Complaint. (dt)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Tennessee resident Robbin Nelson filed a pro se complaint against Heather Sharp and other "real parties in interest." (Doc. No. 1.) The complaint, however, contains unnecessary personally-identifying information for the defendant and other individuals. To address these circumstances, the Clerk's office SHALL place the existing complaint (Doc. No. 1) under seal. The plaintiff MUST, within 30 DAYS of the date of this order, submit an amended complaint that either omits or redacts all personal addresses, telephone numbers, and email addresses. After filing, the Clerk SHALL substitute the amended complaint for the existing complaint and lift the seal.. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/7/2022. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (dt)
July 7, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heather Sharp Via Certified Mail (Stanford, Dennis)
July 6, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Defendant's Answer, notice of Appearance and Motion for Attorney Fees by Heather Sharp.(Stanford, Dennis)
July 6, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Dennis W. Stanford admitted to this court. (dt)
July 6, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt)
July 6, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (dt)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case is assigned to Judge Aleta A. Trauger and was referred to the undersigned pursuant to the Local Rules of Court due to her unavailability. At present it is not apparent that the Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over this action. See Brunner, 543 F.3d at 362. Accordingly, the TRO Motion (Doc. No. #6 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/1/2022. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 1, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION by Robbin Nelson Regarding Notice of #6 EMERGENCEY EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (dt)
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT fo Robbin Nelson in support of #6 EMERGENCEY EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Robbin Nelson. (dt)
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Robbin Nelson. (dt)
July 1, 2022 Filing 6 EMERGENCEY EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Robbin Nelson. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(dt)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed as to Heather Sharp served on 6/13/2022. (dt)
June 13, 2022 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (dt)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Heather Sharp. (Service copies picked up by pro se plaintiff.) (dt)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 RECEIPT #34675066157 in the amount of $402 posted by Robbin Nelson re #1 Complaint. (dt)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 **SEALED PER ORDER #13 ** COMPLAINT against Heather Sharp (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 34675066157), filed by Robbin Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit and Motion from Kentucky Case 14-CI-00479 dated 4/4/2016, #3 Exhibit B - Sua Sponte Order dated 6/9/2016, #4 Exhibit C - Sumner County Sheriff's Office Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Robbin Nelson, #6 Exhibit E - Rule of Contempt filed 8/18/2016, #7 Exhibit F - Supreme Court of Kentucky Order dated 4/4/2012, #8 Exhibit G - Order dated 10/27/2016, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 7/7/2022 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbin Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Sharp
Represented By: Dennis W. Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Robert A. Sharp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jerry Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Minor Child 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Minor Child 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?