Midsouth Commercial Roofing LLC v. Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Midsouth Commercial Roofing LLC
Defendant: Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc. d/b/a Mid South Roofing Systems, a Georgia Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00450
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Midsouth Commercial Roofing LLC. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
August 11, 2022 Filing 15 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Midsouth Commercial Roofing LLC. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
August 1, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Midsouth Commercial Roofing LLC.(VanAusdall, Jacob)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 and #11 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Carrie A. Hanlon and Jason H. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 07/13/2022. (lh)
July 12, 2022 GA State Bar status verified as active for Carrie A. Hanlon and Jason H. Cooper not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
July 11, 2022 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc.. (Kilgore, Lauren)
July 11, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Jason H. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3626706) by Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kilgore, Lauren)
July 11, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION for attorney Carrie A. Hanlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3626697) by Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kilgore, Lauren)
July 11, 2022 Filing 9 Defendant Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc. d/b/a Mid-South Roof Systems' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc..(Kilgore, Lauren)
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Midsouth Commercial Roofing LLC. Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc. served on 6/20/2022. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
June 17, 2022 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Midsouth Commercial Roofing LLC. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/16/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/17/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc. Service copies will be picked up by counsel at the Intake Window. (ln)
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
June 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT against Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3613049) filed by Midsouth Commercial Roofing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cease and Desist Letter, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
June 15, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jacob C. VanAusdall admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midsouth Commercial Roofing LLC v. Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midsouth Commercial Roofing LLC
Represented By: Jacob C. VanAusdall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-South Subcontractors, Inc. d/b/a Mid South Roofing Systems, a Georgia Corporation
Represented By: Carrie A. Hanlon
Represented By: Jason H. Cooper
Represented By: Lauren E. Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?