Spencer v. Cobb et al
Plaintiff: Cheri Darlene Spencer
Defendant: Richard Allen Cobb, CEO of Coca Cola (Name Unknown), Jeff D. Moy, James Fabri and Joey Valenoti
Case Number: 3:2022cv00512
Filed: July 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for want of prosecution. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/25/2022. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 10, 2022 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward. #5 Order, Terminate Motions. Mail sent to Cheri Darlene Spencer. (kc)
July 25, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Return to Sender - No mail Receptacle. Docket Annotation (Service Packet). Mail sent to Cheri Darlene Spencer. (mg)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The application to proceed as a pauper #2 is GRANTED. Plaintiff has not satisfied Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a). The Court will allow Plaintiff an opportunity to address these concerns. In order to proceed, Plaintiff MUST submit an Amended Complaint. The Court MUST receive Plaintiff's submission within 30 DAYS of the date this Order. The Clerk SHALL mail the plaintiff a blank Complaint for a Civil Case (Pro Se 1). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/20/2022. (xc: Pro Se 1 Form and Order forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
July 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
July 11, 2022 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)
July 8, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Cheri Darlene Spencer. (kc)
July 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CEO of Coca Cola (Name Unknown), Richard Allen Cobb, James Fabri, Jeff D. Moy, and Joey Valenoti, filed by Cheri Darlene Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Cobb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Darlene Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO of Coca Cola (Name Unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff D. Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fabri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Valenoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?