Williams et al v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Williams, Christa Cook, Christopher Derick Montgomery and Cameshia Kindred
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc., CoreCivic of Tennessee, Damon T. Hininger, Patrick Swindle, Jason Medlin, Vance Laughlin, Grady Perry, Vincent Vantell, Elaina Rodella, Keith Ivens, John Doe 1 through John Doe 7, Hardin Medical Center, Wayne D. Murray, Anthony Ramirez, Elaina Rodela, Victoria Masterson, Kara Dickman, Tamekio Warren, Denita Jones, Eugene Sapp, Kashundra Brown and Dasity Jones
Case Number: 3:2022cv00571
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO SEVER CLAIMS #18 . The Court finds that the claims of each Plaintiff should be severed from one another under Rule 20(a)(1) and thus chooses to exercise its broad discretion under Rule 21 to sever Plaintiffs' claims into three separate lawsuits. Accordingly, upon receipt of the respective Plaintiffs paying the applicable filing fee for a new civil action ($402), the Clerk is directed open a new case, with a new case number. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/28/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 2, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Miles Thomas Martindale admitted to this court. (kc)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Matthew Z. Huffer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/28/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 18, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Kara Dickman, Victoria Masterson. (Martindale, Miles)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Brian F. Walthart terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/17/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 17, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jack Paul Brewer admitted to this court. (kc)
July 14, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Kara Dickman, Victoria Masterson. (Brewer, Jack)
July 13, 2023 Filing 47 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Keith Brown by Cameshia Kindred. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Last Will of Keith Brown)(Clevenger, Ty)
June 8, 2023 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne D. Murray re #44 Notice (Other) (Miller, Jimmie)
June 8, 2023 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne D. Murray re #43 Answer to Amended Complaint (Miller, Jimmie)
June 8, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#43 and #44 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
June 2, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE by Wayne D. Murray re #30 MOTION to Dismiss and Special Appearance (Miller, Jimmie)
June 2, 2023 Filing 43 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Wayne D. Murray.(Miller, Jimmie)
May 22, 2023 Filing 42 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #38 Summons Reissued as to Wayne D. Murray. Mail sent to Ty Clevenger (af)
May 14, 2023 Filing 41 SUMMONS returned executed by Brenda Williams, Cameshia Kindred, Christa Cook, Christopher Derick Montgomery. Wayne D. Murray served on 5/11/2023. (Goode, Janet)
May 10, 2023 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to re #30 MOTION to Dismiss and Special Appearance (Reply to Response to Motion for Extension of Time #35 ) filed by Christa Cook, Cameshia Kindred, Christopher Derick Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Goode, Janet)
May 3, 2023 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to re #30 MOTION to Dismiss and Special Appearance filed by Wayne D. Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Miller, Jimmie)
April 28, 2023 Filing 38 Summons Reissued as to Wayne D. Murray. Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail. (kc)
April 27, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Alias Summons to be Issued as to Wayne D. Murray. (Goode, Janet)
April 27, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Alias Summons to be Issued as to Wayne D. Murray. (Goode, Janet)
April 25, 2023 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss and Special Appearance and Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Wayne D. Murray, M.D. filed by Christa Cook, Cameshia Kindred, Christopher Derick Montgomery, Brenda Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit postal receipt, #2 Exhibit emails)(Goode, Janet)
April 13, 2023 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE Conformed Certificate of Service filed by Wayne D. Murray re #31 Memorandum in Support filed by Wayne D. Murray. (Miller, Jimmie)
April 13, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE by Wayne D. Murray re #31 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss - EX. A Notice of Intent to Depose Keith Brown (Miller, Jimmie)
April 13, 2023 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE Conformed Certificate of Service filed by Wayne D. Murray re #30 MOTION to Dismiss and Special Appearance filed by Wayne D. Murray. (Miller, Jimmie)
April 12, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#31 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (kc)
April 12, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#30 and #31 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
April 11, 2023 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support of #30 MOTION to Dismiss and Special Appearance filed by Wayne D. Murray . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Jimmie)
April 11, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss and Special Appearance by Wayne D. Murray. (Miller, Jimmie)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: #28 MOTION GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference will be set by separate order after the ruling on the motion to sever. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/28/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
February 27, 2023 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Continue by Christa Cook, Cameshia Kindred, Christopher Derick Montgomery, Brenda Williams. (Goode, Janet)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: MOTION #26 GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to March 1, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/5/2023. (mg)
January 5, 2023 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 3/1/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
January 4, 2023 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Continue by Christa Cook, Cameshia Kindred, Christopher Derick Montgomery, Brenda Williams. (Goode, Janet)
December 13, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to re #18 Joint MOTION to Sever Claims (Joint) filed by Kashundra Brown, CoreCivic of Tennessee, CoreCivic, Inc., Damon T. Hininger, Keith Ivens, Dasity Jones, Denita Jones, Vance Laughlin, Jason Medlin, Grady Perry, Elaina Rodela, Eugene Sapp, Patrick Swindle, Vincent Vantell, Tamekio Warren. (Tilly, Nathan)
December 13, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Ann Weber Langley, James C. Bradshaw, III admitted to this court. (kc)
December 12, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Bradshaw, III on behalf of Hardin Medical Center (Bradshaw, James)
December 6, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Joint MOTION to Sever Claims filed by Christa Cook, Cameshia Kindred, Christopher Derick Montgomery, Brenda Williams. (Goode, Janet)
November 30, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian F. Walthart on behalf of Kara Dickman, Victoria Masterson (Walthart, Brian)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint by CoreCivic of Tennessee, CoreCivic, Inc., Damon T. Hininger, Keith Ivens, Vance Laughlin, Jason Medlin, Grady Perry, Elaina Rodella, Patrick Swindle, Vincent Vantell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/23/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
November 22, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, by CoreCivic of Tennessee, CoreCivic, Inc., Damon T. Hininger, Keith Ivens, Vance Laughlin, Jason Medlin, Grady Perry, Elaina Rodella, Patrick Swindle, Vincent Vantell. (Tilly, Nathan) Modified text on 11/23/2022 (hb).
November 22, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 Joint MOTION to Sever Claims filed by CoreCivic of Tennessee, CoreCivic, Inc., Damon T. Hininger, Keith Ivens, Vance Laughlin, Jason Medlin, Grady Perry, Elaina Rodella, Patrick Swindle, Vincent Vantell . (Tilly, Nathan)
November 22, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Sever Claims by CoreCivic of Tennessee, CoreCivic, Inc., Damon T. Hininger, Keith Ivens, Vance Laughlin, Jason Medlin, Grady Perry, Elaina Rodella, Patrick Swindle, Vincent Vantell. (Tilly, Nathan)
November 8, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Anthony Ramirez.(Miller, Jimmie)
November 7, 2022 Filing 16 Harding Medical Center's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Hardin Medical Center.(Bradshaw, James)
October 26, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Nathan D. Tilly admitted to this court. (kc)
October 26, 2022 ***DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR.*** NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 26 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) Modified on 10/26/2022 (kc).
October 26, 2022 ***Disregard. Entered in Error.*** NOTICE TO FILER re DE#17 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) Modified on 10/26/2022 (kc).
October 26, 2022 ***DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR.*** NOTICE TO FILER re DE#18 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) Modified on 10/26/2022 (kc).
October 24, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D. Tilly on behalf of CoreCivic of Tennessee, CoreCivic, Inc., Damon T. Hininger, Keith Ivens, Vance Laughlin, Jason Medlin, Grady Perry, Elaina Rodella, Patrick Swindle, Vincent Vantell (Tilly, Nathan)
October 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Christa Cook, Cameshia Kindred, Christopher Derick Montgomery, Brenda Williams (Goode, Janet)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference in this matter is continued and reset for January 9, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. by telephone. The Parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please contact chambers at 615-736-7344. The Plaintiff is reminded that compliance with this Courts orders is not optional and relief from those orders should be sought by filing an appropriate motion with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/30/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 26, 2022 Filing 12 Summons issued as to CoreCivic of Tennessee, CoreCivic, Inc., Hardin Medical Center, Damon T. Hininger, Keith Ivens, Vance Laughlin, Jason Medlin, Wayne D. Murray, Grady Perry, Anthony Ramirez, Elaina Rodella, Patrick Swindle, Vincent Vantell. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
September 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to all defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons - Anthony Ramirez, #2 Attachment Summons - CoreCivic of TN, #3 Attachment Summons - CoreCivic, #4 Attachment Summons - Damon T. Hininger, #5 Attachment Summons - Dasity Jones, #6 Attachment Summons - Denita Jones, #7 Attachment Summons - Elaine Rodella, #8 Attachment Summons - Eugene Sapp, #9 Attachment Summons - Grady Perry, #10 Attachment Summons - Hardin Medical Center, #11 Attachment Summons - Jason Medlin, #12 Attachment Summons - Kara Dickman, #13 Attachment Summons - Kashundra Brown, #14 Attachment Summons - Keith Ivens, #15 Attachment Summons - Patrick Swindle, #16 Attachment Summons - Tamekio Warren, #17 Attachment Summons - Vance Laughlin, #18 Attachment Summons - Victoria Masterson, #19 Attachment Summons - Vince Vantell, #20 Attachment Summons - Wayne D. Murray)(Goode, Janet)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Ty Clevenger's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/19/2022. (lh)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Ty Clevenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Further, upon conclusion of the proceeding currently pending in the United States District Court Northern District of California, Case No. C22-80167MISCJD, Counsel is directed file a status report updating the Court regarding his admission status. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/12/2022. (lh)
September 8, 2022 TX State Bar status verified as active for Ty Clevenger not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
September 7, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Ty Clevenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3662623) by Christopher Derick Montgomery, Brenda Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Declaration)(Goode, Janet)
August 26, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brenda Williams, Cameshia Kindred, Christa Cook, Christopher Derick Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Goode, Janet)
August 24, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Ty Clevenger's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Christa Cook, Cameshia Kindred, Christopher Derick Montgomery, Brenda Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Response to Show-Cause Order, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Goode, Janet)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/3/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 9/30/2022 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
August 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
August 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
August 3, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Janet H. Goode admitted to this court. (kc)
August 3, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ty Clevenger: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/24/2022. (kc)
August 3, 2022 TX State Bar status verified as active for Ty Clevenger not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (kc)
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CoreCivic of Tennessee, CoreCivic, Inc., Hardin Medical Center, Damon T. Hininger, Keith Ivens, John Doe 1 through John Doe 7, Vance Laughlin, Jason Medlin, Wayne D. Murray, Grady Perry, Anthony Ramirez, Elaina Rodella, Patrick Swindle, Vincent Vantell (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNDC-3638944), filed by Brenda Williams, Cameshia Kindred, Christa Cook, Christopher Derick Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Williams
Represented By: Janet H. Goode
Represented By: Ty Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Cook
Represented By: Janet H. Goode
Represented By: Ty Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Derick Montgomery
Represented By: Janet H. Goode
Represented By: Ty Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameshia Kindred
Represented By: Janet H. Goode
Represented By: Ty Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic of Tennessee
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon T. Hininger
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Swindle
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Medlin
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance Laughlin
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady Perry
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Vantell
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaina Rodella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ivens
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 through John Doe 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardin Medical Center
Represented By: Ann Weber Langley
Represented By: James C. Bradshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne D. Murray
Represented By: Jimmie C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Ramirez
Represented By: Jimmie C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaina Rodela
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Masterson
Represented By: Brian F. Walthart
Represented By: Matthew Z. Huffer
Represented By: Jack Paul Brewer
Represented By: Miles Thomas Martindale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Dickman
Represented By: Brian F. Walthart
Represented By: Matthew Z. Huffer
Represented By: Jack Paul Brewer
Represented By: Miles Thomas Martindale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamekio Warren
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denita Jones
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Sapp
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kashundra Brown
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dasity Jones
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?