Lawrence v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County
Plaintiff: Maggie Lawrence
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County
Case Number: 3:2022cv00680
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Andrew Puckett on behalf of Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County (Puckett, Benjamin)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelli F. Woodward on behalf of Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County (Woodward, Kelli)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's unopposed motion to reschedule the Initial Case Management Conference, filed October 27, 2022, Docket Entry No. #8 . For the reasons requested, the motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from November 1, 2022, to 10:30 a.m., Tuesday, November 29, 2022, by telephone conference using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. See Docket Entry No. #3 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/28/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County.(Fox, J.)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings per Order #10 : Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 11/29/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Case Management Order and to Reset the Case Management Conference by Maggie Lawrence. (Bigelow, Robert)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County answer due 10/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/28/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County. (Fox, J.)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Maggie Lawrence. Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County served on 9/9/2022. (Bigelow, Robert) Modified on 9/14/2022 (kc).
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons issued as to Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 11/1/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Charles Bigelow admitted to this court. (kc)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3659876), filed by Maggie Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Lawrence
Represented By: Robert Charles Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Puckett
Represented By: J. Brooks Fox
Represented By: Kelli F. Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?