Stockley et al v. Nissan of North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jean Stockley, Brianna Williams, Elizabeth Burns and Loretta Munford
Defendant: Nissan of North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00709
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AGREED ORDER: Upon the Agreed Motion #13 of Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. ("Defendant") and by agreement of the parties, as evidenced by the signatures of counsel below, Defendant shall respond to the Class Action Complaint on or before Monday, December 5, 2022. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESET for 12/19/2022 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/7/2022. (mg)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Nissan of North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Agreed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Hicks, John)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference in this case is RESET for Monday, December 5, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/2022. (ln)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Upon the Agreed Motion of Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. ("Defendant") and by agreement of the parties, as evidenced by the signatures of counsel below, Defendant shall respond to the Class Action Complaint on or before Monday, November 14, 2022. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/6/2022. (mg)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion Extending Time to Respond to the Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/6/2022. (mg)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order Granting Extension of Time by Nissan of North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint)(Hicks, John)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 and #7 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Mark Greenstone and Benjamin Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/30/2022. (lh)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ME State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin Donahue not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg) Modified on 9/30/2022 (mg). Modified on 9/30/2022 (mg).
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Benjamin Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3675874) by Elizabeth Burns, Loretta Munford, Jean Stockley, Brianna Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Mark Greenstone to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3675865) by Elizabeth Burns, Loretta Munford, Jean Stockley, Brianna Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2022 at 03:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons issued as to Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan of North America, Inc./ Serve Registered Agent. Service copies will be picked up by counsel between the hours of 8:00 a.m. to 4:00 p.m. Monday - Friday at Intake. (mg)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., and Nissan of North America, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3665485), filed by Brianna Williams, Jean Stockley, Elizabeth Burns, Loretta Munford. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for James Gerard Stranch, IV, Benjamin A. Gastel admitted to this court. (mg)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Mark Greenstone, Benjamin Donahue: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/4/2022. (mg)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order CA State Bar status verified as active for Mark Greenstone not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockley et al v. Nissan of North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Stockley
Represented By: Benjamin Donahue
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Mark Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Williams
Represented By: Benjamin Donahue
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Mark Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Burns
Represented By: Benjamin Donahue
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Mark Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Munford
Represented By: Benjamin Donahue
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Mark Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan of North America, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?