Smith v. CRH Medical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Martha Elizabeth Smith
Defendant: CRH Medical Corporation and CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00743
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The filing of an Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 20) renders moot the pending Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by the defendants (Doc. No. #15 ), which motion is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. The initial case management conference scheduled for November 22, 2022 is hereby RESET for December 19, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/17/2022. (ds)
November 15, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC, CRH Medical Corporation, filed by Martha Elizabeth Smith.(Teeples, N.)
November 14, 2022 Filing 19 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Martha Elizabeth Smith. (Teeples, N.)
November 8, 2022 Filing 18 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Entities)(Freimann, Michael)
November 8, 2022 Filing 17 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CRH Medical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Entities)(Freimann, Michael)
November 8, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#13 , #14 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the documents using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. Also, the correct case number for this matter is 3:22-cv-00743. Counsel shall use this case number for all futurefilings. (ln)
November 7, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss Partially filed by CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC, CRH Medical Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Charge of Discrimination)(Freimann, Michael)
November 7, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Partially by CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC, CRH Medical Corporation. (Freimann, Michael)
November 7, 2022 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC. (Freimann, Michael)
November 7, 2022 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CRH Medical Corporation. (Freimann, Michael)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Michael A. Freimann to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/31/2022. (lh)
October 25, 2022 CO State Bar status verified as active for Michael Adam Freimann not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
October 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Michael A. Freimann to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendants (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3691191) by CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC, CRH Medical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission - Michael Freimann)(Peters, Mark)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Motion #9 GRANTED. Extension to 11/7/2022. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/24/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 24, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark W. Peters admitted to this court. (ln)
October 21, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint by CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC, CRH Medical Corporation. (Peters, Mark) Modified on 10/24/2022 (ln).
October 17, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Martha Elizabeth Smith. CRH Medical Corporation served on 10/3/2022. (Teeples, N.)
October 11, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Martha Elizabeth Smith. CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC served on 10/3/2022. (Teeples, N.)
October 10, 2022 Filing 6 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed for CRH Anesthesia Management, served on 10/3/22 Acknowledgement filed by Martha Elizabeth Smith. (Teeples, N.)
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2022 at 1:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 Summons issued as to CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC, CRH Medical Corporation. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC, CRH Medical Corporation (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3672441) filed by Martha Elizabeth Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Right-to-Sue Letter, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/23/2022) (ln).
September 23, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles P. Yezbak, III, Melody Fowler-Green, N. Chase Teeples admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. CRH Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Charles P. Yezbak, III
Represented By: Melody Fowler-Green
Represented By: N. Chase Teeples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRH Medical Corporation
Represented By: Mark W. Peters
Represented By: Michael Adam Freimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRH Anesthesia Management, LLC
Represented By: Mark W. Peters
Represented By: Michael Adam Freimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?