Alsup v. Experian Information Solutions Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Alsup
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Trans Union LLC and Ally Financial Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00745
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Polly, Erin)
November 21, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Ally Financial Inc..(Hearn, Jr., Don)
November 21, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for attorney Ethan G. Ostroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3710444) by Ally Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hearn, Jr., Don)
November 18, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement with Defendant Equifax, Inc by Bradley Alsup (Slocum, Keith)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Trans Union Answer due by 11/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/24/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ****DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR.**** ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/21/22. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad) Modified on 10/21/2022 (ln).
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Trans Union LLC answer due 11/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/21/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 21, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Trans Union LLC. (Anthony, David)
October 21, 2022 Filing 17 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union LLC. (Anthony, David)
October 21, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Anthony on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Anthony, David)
October 20, 2022 Filing 15 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Kester, Kymberly)
October 20, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Kester, Kymberly)
October 20, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kymberly S. Kester on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Kester, Kymberly)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: MOTION #10 for Extension of time to Respond to Complaint #1 GRANTED. Ally Financial Inc.'s answer due 11/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/20/2022. (ln)
October 19, 2022 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ally Financial Inc.. (Hearn, Jr., Don)
October 19, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint [Proposed Order Submitted] by Ally Financial Inc.. (Hearn, Jr., Don)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: MOTION #7 for Enlargement GRANTED. Experian Information Solutions Inc.'s answer due 11/21/2022. In light of the extension, the Initial Case Management Conference is continued to December 7, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. by telephone. The parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/18/2022. (ln)
October 18, 2022 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 12/7/2022 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
October 17, 2022 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
October 17, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
October 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Palmer Polly on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Polly, Erin)
September 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/17/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
September 24, 2022 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Ally Financial Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Trans Union LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
September 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
September 24, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Keith D. Slocum admitted to this court. (mg)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ally Financial Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Trans Union LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3672605), filed by Bradley Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - BNC Meeting of Creditors Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Claim, #3 Exhibit 3 - BNC Confirmation Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Mrs. Alsup's BK payments, #5 Exhibit 5 - Trustee Ledger for Payments to Ally Financial, #6 Exhibit 6 - Equifax credit report portion prior to dispute, #7 Exhibit 7 - Trans Union credit report portion prior to dispute, #8 Exhibit 8 - Experian credit report portion prior to dispute, #9 Exhibit 9 - Dispute to Equifax, #10 Exhibit 10 - Dispute to Trans Union, #11 Exhibit 11 - Dispute to Experian, #12 Exhibit 12 - Equifax Response following Dispute, #13 Exhibit 13 - Trans Union Response following Dispute, #14 Exhibit 14 - Experian Response following Dispute, #15 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsup v. Experian Information Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Alsup
Represented By: Keith D. Slocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Kymberly S. Kester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: David M. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Don L. Hearn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?