Hicks et al v. Cantrell et al
Plaintiff: Grant Hicks, Tristan Nixon and Lucas Mario Nutt
Defendant: Wesley Cantrell, Jonathan Fenoy, John Doe, Taylor Wright, Sean Martin, Craig Snider, Chief Michael Bowen and City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2022cv00746
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jonathan Fenoy.(Burns, Robert)
November 14, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Taylor Wright.(Burns, Robert)
November 14, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wesley Cantrell.(Burns, Robert)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2023. Discovery due by 9/29/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 2/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/14/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 8, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert M. Burns admitted to this court. (ln)
November 7, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 11/7/2022; ORDER to enter. (Tape #not recorded.) (Hearing lasted :28)(jwc)
November 7, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of Wesley Cantrell, Jonathan Fenoy, Taylor Wright (Burns, Robert)
November 4, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Sean Martin in his Individual Capacity by Sean Martin.(Mazzota, William)
November 4, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael Bowen, City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Sean Martin, Craig Snider.(Mazzota, William)
November 3, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for William C. Mazzota admitted to this court. (ln)
November 2, 2022 Filing 20 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wright, Samuel)
November 2, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by William C. Mazzota on behalf of Michael Bowen, City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Sean Martin, Craig Snider. (Mazzota, William)
November 1, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by Grant Hicks. City of Murfreesboro served 10/10/2022. Michael Bowen served 10/10/2022. Craig Snider served 10/10/2022. Sean Martin served 10/10/2022.Jonathan Fenoy served 10/10/2022. Wesley Cantrell served 10/10/2022. Taylor Wright served 10/10/2022. (Wright, Samuel) Modified service information on 11/3/2022 (ln).
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, DE #16 is GRANTED. Michael Bowen's answer due 11/4/2022; City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee's answer due 11/4/2022; Sean Martin's answer due 11/4/2022; Craig Snider's answer due 11/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/19/2022. (ln)
October 19, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Michael Bowen, City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Sean Martin, Craig Snider. (Berexa, Kristin)
October 18, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kristin Ellis Berexa, Patrick K. Morrison admitted to this court. (ln)
October 17, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick K. Morrison on behalf of Michael Bowen, City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Sean Martin, Craig Snider (Morrison, Patrick)
October 17, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Ellis Berexa on behalf of Michael Bowen, City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Sean Martin, Craig Snider (Berexa, Kristin)
September 27, 2022 Filing 13 Summons issued as to Wesley Cantrell. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Wesley Cantrell. (Wright, Samuel)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/26/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 10 Summons issued as to Michael Bowen, City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Jonathan Fenoy, Sean Martin, Craig Snider, Taylor Wright. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
September 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Jonathan Fenoy. (Wright, Samuel)
September 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Sean Martin. (Wright, Samuel)
September 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Taylor Wright. (Wright, Samuel)
September 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Craig Snider. (Wright, Samuel)
September 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Michael Bowen. (Wright, Samuel)
September 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to City of Murfreesboro. (Wright, Samuel)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/7/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Bowen, Wesley Cantrell, City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, John Doe, Jonathan Fenoy, Sean Martin, Craig Snider, Taylor Wright (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-367267) filed by Tristan Nixon, Grant Hicks, Lucas Mario Nutt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
September 23, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Samuel C. Wright admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks et al v. Cantrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Hicks
Represented By: Samuel C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan Nixon
Represented By: Samuel C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Mario Nutt
Represented By: Samuel C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Cantrell
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Fenoy
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Wright
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Martin
Represented By: Kristin Ellis Berexa
Represented By: Patrick K. Morrison
Represented By: William C. Mazzota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Snider
Represented By: Kristin Ellis Berexa
Represented By: Patrick K. Morrison
Represented By: William C. Mazzota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Michael Bowen
Represented By: Kristin Ellis Berexa
Represented By: Patrick K. Morrison
Represented By: William C. Mazzota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee
Represented By: Kristin Ellis Berexa
Represented By: Patrick K. Morrison
Represented By: William C. Mazzota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?